|
11.05.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
10.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.03.2023 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2023 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.09.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.03.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.03.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
15.09.2021 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
07.09.2021 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2021 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
34 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
31 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
62 |
|
20.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
65 |
|
25.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
33 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
20.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
18 |