|
23.02.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
46 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
42 |
|
11.11.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Description |
Appeal |
46 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
19 |
|
05.07.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
19 |
|
06.12.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.12.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.12.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Opposition |
26 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
28 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
14.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
43 |