blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2550235

EP2550235 - METHOD FOR MAKING HIGHLY POROUS, STABLE ALUMINIUM OXIDE WITH A CONTROLLED PORE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/05]METHOD FOR MAKING HIGHLY POROUS, STABLE METAL OXIDE WITH A CONTROLLED PORE STRUCTURE
[2019/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brigham Young University
Technology Transfer Office 3760 Harold B. Lee Library
Provo, UT 84602 / US
[2019/27]
Former [2013/05]For all designated states
Brigham Young University
Technology Transfer Office 3760 Harold B. Lee Library
Provo, UT 84602 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARTHOLOMEW, Calvin, H.
440 North 600 East
Orem UT 84097 / US
02 / WOODFIELD, Brian, F.
1463 East 920 South
Provo UT 84606 / US
03 / HUANG, Baiyu
1610 South 490 East
Orem UT 84058 / US
04 / OLSEN, Rebecca, Elizabeth
556 Walnut Brook Drive
Murray UT 84107 / US
05 / ASTLE, Lynn
1431 Oakcrest Lane
Provo UT 84604 / US
 [2013/05]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/27]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2013/05]Cooper, John, et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11760091.622.03.2011
[2019/27]
WO2011US29472
Priority number, dateUS20100340762P22.03.2010         Original published format: US 340762 P
[2013/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2011119638
Date:29.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2550235
Date:30.01.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2550235
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR19.01.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:C01G23/047, C01G25/02, C01B13/36, C01F7/34
[2015/25]
CPC:
C01F7/34 (EP,US); C01B13/36 (EP,US); C01B13/363 (EP,US);
C01G25/02 (EP,US); C01P2002/60 (EP,US); C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US); C01P2006/12 (EP,US); C01P2006/13 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US); C01P2006/16 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2013/05]C01B13/18, C01F7/44, C01G23/047
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHPORÖSEN STABILEN ALUMINIUMOXIDS MIT GESTEUERTER PORENSTRUKTUR[2019/04]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING HIGHLY POROUS, STABLE ALUMINIUM OXIDE WITH A CONTROLLED PORE STRUCTURE[2019/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'OXYDES D'ALUMINIUM STABLES, TRÈS POREUX À STRUCTURE DE PORES CONTRÔLÉE[2019/04]
Former [2013/05]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHPORÖSEN STABILEN METALLOXIDS MIT GESTEUERTER PORENSTRUKTUR
Former [2013/05]METHOD FOR MAKING HIGHLY POROUS, STABLE METAL OXIDE WITH A CONTROLLED PORE STRUCTURE
Former [2013/05]PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES STABLES, TRÈS POREUX À STRUCTURE DE PORES CONTRÔLÉE
Entry into regional phase02.10.2012National basic fee paid 
02.10.2012Search fee paid 
02.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/05]
15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2019Fee for grant paid
21.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2017
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.03.2011
AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CY03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
MC03.07.2019
MK03.07.2019
MT03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
IE22.03.2020
LU22.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU22.03.2011
AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CY03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
MC03.07.2019
MT03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
IE22.03.2020
LU22.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/12]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
MC03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
IE22.03.2020
LU22.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/08]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
MC03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
IE22.03.2020
LU22.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/04]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
MC03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
LU22.03.2020
Former [2020/49]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
MC03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/37]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SI03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/36]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/27]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
SM03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
SK03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
IT03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
PL03.07.2019
RO03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/22]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
DK03.07.2019
EE03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/17]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
TR03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/15]AL03.07.2019
AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/12]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/11]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/10]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/09]CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/08]LT03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US4622311  (WAKUI TADAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 15 * example 1; table 1 *;
 [X]WO2006070203  (MAGNESIUM ELEKTRON LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15 * abstract *;
 [X]CN1986409  (UNIV WUHAN [CN]) [X] 15 * the whole document *;
 [XI]US2008032132  (WOODFIELD BRIAN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0030] - [0034] - [0037] - [0040] - [0046] , [0048] , [0050] , [0053] , [0054]; examples 5,29 * [I] 3,6-14;
 [X]WO2009061707  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 15* page 3, line 4 - line 12 *;
 [X]  - WU W ET AL, "Preparation of nanocrystalline zinc carbonate and zinc oxide via solid-state reaction at room temperature", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 60, no. 21-22, ISSN 0167-577X, (20060901), pages 2791 - 2794, (20060901), XP027898135 [X] 1,4,15 * Section 2.2 Preparation of ZnCO3 and ZnO *
 [X]  - LI F ET AL, "One-step solid-state reaction synthesis and gas sensing property of tin oxide nanoparticles", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, CH, vol. 81, no. 2-3, ISSN 0925-4005, (20020105), pages 165 - 169, (20020105), XP027370064 [X] 1,15 * Section 2.1 Preparation of SnO2 nanoparticles *
International search[A]US3900387  (WILHELM FREDERICK C);
 [A]US6027706  (PINNAVAIA THOMAS J [US], et al);
 [A]US6558847  (KAWAKAMI SOICHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2006110314  (TORARDI CARMINE [US]);
 [A]US2008032132  (WOODFIELD BRIAN F [US], et al);
 [A]EP1894626  (CHIYODA CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.