EP2487977 - Method and equipment for initializing cognitive system supported by cognitive pilot channel, and system thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/33] | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR INITIALIZING COGNITIVE SYSTEM SUPPORTED BY COGNITIVE PILOT CHANNEL, AND SYSTEM THEREOF | ||
[2014/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Guang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11768379.7 | 23.02.2011 | WO2011CN71189 | Priority number, date | CN201010150099 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: CN201010150099 | [2012/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011127767 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487977 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487977 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W72/0453 (EP);
H04W76/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Ausrüstung zur durch einen kognitiven Pilotkanal unterstützten Initialisierung eines kognitiven Systems sowie System dafür | [2014/32] | English: | Method and equipment for initializing cognitive system supported by cognitive pilot channel, and system thereof | [2014/32] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour initialiser un système cognitif supporté par un canal pilote cognitif et système associé | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/33] | VERFAHREN UND AUSRÜSTUNG ZUR DURCH EINEN KOGNITIVEN PILOTKANAL UNTERSTÜTZTEN INITIALISIERUNG EINES KOGNITIVEN SYSTEMS SOWIE SYSTEM DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/33] | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR INITIALIZING COGNITIVE SYSTEM SUPPORTED BY COGNITIVE PILOT CHANNEL, AND SYSTEM THEREOF | ||
Former [2012/33] | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT POUR INITIALISER UN SYSTÈME COGNITIF SUPPORTÉ PAR UN CANAL PILOTE COGNITIF ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2012 | Translation filed | 10.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 14.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2011 | AL | 17.12.2014 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | RS | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | IE | 23.02.2015 | LU | 23.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | PT | 17.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.02.2011 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009239530 (LUO JIJUN [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0009] - [0018], [0028] - [0051], [0072], [0073]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2008119381 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 5, to page 9, line 7; page 11, line 16, to page 16, line 6; figures 1-15 * | [I] - "Reconfigurable Radio Systems (RRS); Cognitive Pilot Channel (CPC)", ETSI DRAFT; TR_102683V010101P, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20091001), no. V1.1.1, pages 1 - 38, XP014051194 [I] 1-17 * chapter 1; chapter 4, in particular sections 4.1.1, 4.1.2, 4.1.3, 4.2; chapter 5, in particular section 5.4; chapter 6, in particular sections 6.1, 6.2, 6.3.2, 6.4.2; chapter 7, in particular sections 7.1, 7.3.1, 7.3.2; chapter 8; chapter 9; figures 1, 2, 8, 12, 13 * | [A] - "Reconfigurable Radio Systems (RRS); Cognitive Radio System Concept", ETSI DRAFT; 01002V012__FINAL_DRAFT_PROPOSED_TR_ON_CR_SYSTEM_CONCEPT, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20091215), no. V0.1.2, pages 1 - 30, XP014051139 [A] 1-17 * chapter 4, in particular sections 4.1, 4.2; chapter 5, in particular sections 5.1, 5.2, 5.4 * | International search | [A]CN1996784 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM [CN]); | [A]CN101257714 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]); | [A]WO2008119380 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al); | [A]CN101395940 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]CN101478352 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM [CN]) |