EP2630271 - MODULAR COATER SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2014/18] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECOMTE, Benoit AGC Glass Europe R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 02 /
WIAME, Hugues Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 03 /
YONEMICHI, Tomohiro ASAHI Glass Co Ltd. Meltin and Forming 1-1 Suehirocho Tsurumi-Ku, Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 230-0045 / JP | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre Intellectual Property Department Rue Louis Blériot 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | ||
Former [2013/35] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de l'Aurore 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 11772954.1 | 18.10.2011 | [2021/12] | WO2011EP68176 | Priority number, date | EP20100188560 | 22.10.2010 Original published format: EP 10188560 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012052428 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630271 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2630271 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, C23C16/54, C03C17/00 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
C03C17/002 (EP,US);
C23C14/35 (KR);
C23C14/34 (US);
C03C17/00 (KR);
C23C14/56 (KR);
C23C14/564 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE BESCHICHTERTRENNUNG | [2013/35] | English: | MODULAR COATER SEPARATION | [2013/35] | French: | SÉPARATION PAR DISPOSITIF DE REVÊTEMENT MODULAIRE | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 22.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2021
03.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Bühler AG Gupfenstrasse 5 9240 Uzwil / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2022/06] | 18.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.03.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2023 | 16.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 09.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0078/24 | 09.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 08.03.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0078/24 | 09.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 06.03.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2011 | AL | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SE | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | IE | 18.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 18.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 18.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | EE | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5420044 (KOZUKA HIRAKU [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 6, line 56 - column 9, line 12; figure 2 * [I] 3-8,11-13; | [A]WO2005106069 (ARDENNE ANLAGENTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 8; figures 2,3 *; | [XI]DE102008019427 (ARDENNE ANLAGENTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 5, paragraphs 29-33; figure 1 * [I] 3,7,8,11-13; | [XI]WO2009155119 (ALTA DEVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * page 5, paragraphs 16,17 * * page 8, paragraph 26 * * page 9, paragraph 28 * * page 24, paragraph 77 - page 25, paragraph 80 * * page 27, paragraph 86 - page 32, paragraph 91 * * page 37, paragraph 109 - page 38, paragraph 110 * * page 41, paragraph 119 * * page 42, paragraph 121 * * figures 11-17 * [I] 1-8,11-13; | [A]WO2010089460 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [XI]US2010206229 (HE GANG [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * page 2, paragraphs 36-38; figure 1C * * page 4, paragraphs 53,54; figure 2b * [I] 1-8,11-13; | [A]DE102009029902 (ARDENNE ANLAGENTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 4, paragraph 32 - page 5, paragraph 40; figures 1-3 * | Examination | WO2011034751 | WO2011097012 | Opposition | US2004058293 | US2002020496 | DE4313284 | EP0106521 |