EP2611472 - METHODS OF RECELLULARIZING A TISSUE OR ORGAN FOR IMPROVED TRANSPLANTABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 600 McNamara Alumni Center 200 Oak Street SE Minneapolis, MN 55455-2020 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 1000 Westgate Drive, Suite 160 St. Paul, Minnesota 55114-8658 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Doris 929 Lombard Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55105 / US | 02 /
KREN, Stefan M. 810 29th Avenue S. Minneapolis Minnesota 55406 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11776927.3 | 01.09.2011 | [2016/06] | WO2011US50266 | Priority number, date | US20100379073P | 01.09.2010 Original published format: US 379073 P | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012031162 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611472 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611472 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/38 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61L27/3604 (EP,US);
A61L27/36 (KR,RU);
A61L27/38 (KR,RU);
C12N5/0062 (US);
A61L27/3808 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N5/069 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REZELLULARISIERUNG EINES GEWEBES ODER ORGANS FÜR VERBESSERTE TRANPLANTATIONSFÄHIGKEIT | [2013/28] | English: | METHODS OF RECELLULARIZING A TISSUE OR ORGAN FOR IMPROVED TRANSPLANTABILITY | [2013/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECELLULARISATION D'UN TISSU OU D'UN ORGANE POUR UNE TRANSPLANTABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 04.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2011 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | RS | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | IE | 01.09.2016 | LU | 01.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.09.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.09.2016 | ||
LU | 01.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.09.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.09.2016 | ||
LU | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 01.09.2016 | ||
LU | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 10.02.2016 | |
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6479064 (ATALA ANTHONY [US]); | [X]US2003124099 (ATALA ANTHONY [US]); | [XI]US2009202977 (OTT HARALD [US], et al) | by applicant | US5071741 | WO9204033 | WO9314191 | WO9507611 | WO9627287 | WO9629862 | WO9814058 | US6376244 | US6753181 | WO2007025233 | WO1999US24630 |