EP2705570 - A DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AND/OR EMITTING A WAVE, A SYSTEM COMPRISING THE DEVICE, AND USE OF SUCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVANTIX 655 avenue Galilée Bâtiment Horizon BP 20140 13794 Aix-en-Provence cedex 3 / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Time Reversal Communications Parc Saint Christophe 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95861 Cergy-Pontoise Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEROSEY, Geoffroy 90 rue du Temple F-75003 Paris / FR | 02 /
LERAY, Christian 42 allée de la Louvière F-95800 Courdimanche / FR | 03 /
LEMOULT, Fabrice 14 rue de la Cossonnerie F-75001 Paris / FR | 04 /
DE ROSNY, Julien 19 rue Brillet F-94130 Nogent sur Marne / FR | 05 /
TOURIN, Arnaud 65 rue Ernest Renan F-92310 Sèvres / FR | 06 /
FINK, Mathias 16 rue Edouard Laferière F-92190 Meudon / FR | [2014/46] |
Former [2014/11] | 01 /
LEROSEY, Geoffroy 90 rue du Temple F-75003 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
LERAY, Christian 42 allée de la Louvière F-95800 Courdimanche / FR | |||
03 /
LEMOULT, Fabrice 3 rue Véronèse F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
DE ROSNY, Julien 19 rue Brillet F-94130 Nogent sur Marne / FR | |||
05 /
TOURIN, Arnaud 65 rue Ernest Renan F-92310 Sèvres / FR | |||
06 /
FINK, Mathias 16 rue Edouard Laferière F-92190 Meudon / FR | Representative(s) | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | [2020/28] |
Former [2014/35] | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, Rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/11] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11779214.3 | 06.05.2011 | [2020/28] | WO2011IB02453 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012153164 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2705570 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705570 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/40, H01Q3/44, H01Q15/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H01Q15/006 (EP,US);
H01Q1/40 (EP,US);
H01Q3/446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN UND/ODER SENDEN EINER WELLE, SYSTEM MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG DIESER VORRICHTUNG | [2014/11] | English: | A DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AND/OR EMITTING A WAVE, A SYSTEM COMPRISING THE DEVICE, AND USE OF SUCH DEVICE | [2014/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA RÉCEPTION ET/OU L'ÉMISSION D'UNE ONDE, SYSTÈME COMPRENANT LE DISPOSITIF, ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 12.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2014 | 31.05.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2011 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0171774 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2008003991 (ITI SCOTLAND LTD [GB], et al) [A] 8-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2008007024 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US7522105 (LACOMB JULIE ANNE [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XI] - NURIA LLOMBART ET AL, "1-D Scanning Arrays on Dense Dielectrics Using PCS-EBG Technology", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070101), vol. 55, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TAP.2006.888435, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 26 - 35, XP011154669 [X] 1,3,5,17,18 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,6-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.2006.888435 | by applicant | FR2863109 | WO2008007024 |