EP2635945 - CONTROLLER FOR BIOFUEL-FIRED BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/37] | INTELLIGENTLY-CONTROLLED CATALYTIC CONVERTER FOR BIOFUEL-FIRED BOILER | ||
[2019/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomass Controls PBC 99 Canal Street Putnam, CT 06260 / US | [2019/28] |
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Biomass Controls, LLC 99 Canal Street Putnam, CT 06260 / US | ||
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Clearstak LLC 99 Canal Street PO Box 109 Putnam, Connecticut 06260 / US | ||
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Clearstak LLC 479 Tolland Turnpike Willington, CT 06279 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, John 87 Ragged Hill Rd Pomfret Ctr CT 06259 / US | 02 /
FRAGA, Matt 38 London Rd Hebron CT 06248 / US | 03 /
DITHRICH, Eric 29 Paige Hill Rd Brimfield MA 01010 / US | 04 /
HALLOWELL, Jeffrey, R. 30 Cutler Hill Road Woodstock CT 06281 / US | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/38] |
Former [2013/37] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11782744.4 | 05.11.2011 | [2019/38] | WO2011US59480 | Priority number, date | US20100410598P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 410598 P | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012061795 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2635945 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2635945 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/00, F23B90/08, F23N3/04 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
F23N3/085 (EP,US);
B01D53/8696 (US);
F23B90/08 (EP,US);
F23G5/00 (US);
F23G7/00 (US);
F23G7/07 (EP,US);
F23G7/10 (EP,US);
F23N3/042 (EP,US);
F23N5/006 (EP,US);
F23N5/022 (EP,US);
G05B13/00 (US);
G05B15/00 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
B01D53/9495 (US);
F23N2223/04 (US);
F23N2223/08 (US);
F23N2225/10 (EP,US);
F23N2227/12 (US);
F23N2233/04 (EP,US);
F23N2233/08 (EP,US);
F23N2235/06 (EP,US);
F23N2237/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/37] | G05D23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERGERÄT FÜR EINEN BIOKRAFTSTOFFBEFEUERTEN HEIZKESSEL | [2019/16] | English: | CONTROLLER FOR BIOFUEL-FIRED BOILER | [2019/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR CHAUDIÈRE CHAUFFANT AU BIOCARBURANT | [2019/16] |
Former [2013/37] | INTELLIGENT GESTEUERTER KATALYSATORWANDLER FÜR EINEN BIOKRAFTSTOFFBEFEUERTEN HEIZKESSEL | ||
Former [2013/37] | INTELLIGENTLY-CONTROLLED CATALYTIC CONVERTER FOR BIOFUEL-FIRED BOILER | ||
Former [2013/37] | CONVERTISSEUR CATALYTIQUE À COMMANDE INTELLIGENTE POUR CHAUDIÈRE CHAUFFANT AU BIOCARBURANT | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 11.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2011 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | LU | 05.11.2019 | FR | 18.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 05.11.2011 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.11.2011 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.11.2011 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4495873 (BLANKENSHIP ERNEST B [US]) [X] 1-3,6,21 * column 3, lines 16-33 * * column 4, lines 15-23 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0529368 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,25,26 * column 13, lines 8-39; figure 15 *; | [A]US5499622 (WOODS MAURICE G [US]) [A] 1,21,25 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO0008390 (JAASMA DENNIS [US]) [A] 1,6,21,25 * page 23, line 25 - page 24, line 29; figure 19 *; | [A]US2006157047 (TIEGS PAUL E [US]) [A] 1,6,21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0022] , [0026] - [0030] *; | [A]EP2039995 (MIURA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,7-18,27-29 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009144393 (FONDIS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A]FR2939870 (FONDIS SA [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 8 *; | [A]WO2010075580 (TIEGS PAUL E [US]) [A] 1,6,21,25 * paragraphs [0073] , [0079] , [0080]; figure 12 * |