EP2732600 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTSCHLER, Christopher Schleifmühlstrasse 6a 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
WITT, Nicolas Gabelsbergerstrasse 10 90459 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
PHILIPPSEN, Michael Tucherstrasse 29 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 04 /
OTTO, Stephan Saranskstrasse 1b 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/21] | 01 /
MUTSCHLER, Christopher Schleifmühlstrasse 6a 91054 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
WITT, Nicolas Neue Gasse 18 90403 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03 /
PHILIPPSEN, Michael Tucherstrasse 29 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | |||
04 /
OTTO, Stephan Saranskstrasse 1b 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/21] | 2SPL Patentanwälte Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11784447.2 | 31.10.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011EP69160 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013064172 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732600 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732600 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L69/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EREIGNISSYNCHRONISATION | [2015/32] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING EVENTS | [2014/21] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR LA SYNCRONISATION DES EVENEMENTS | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/21] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EREIGNISSYNCHRONISIERUNG | ||
Former [2014/21] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2011 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005125150 (WANG DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11,14,17,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 2 * * claim 59 * [I] 5-7,13,15; | [X]US2007070914 (ABIGAIL SHAWN G [CA]) [X] 1,14,17,18* abstract *; | [X]EP2301635 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,14,17,18 * abstract * | by applicant | US2005125150 | US2007070914 | EP2301635 |