EP2579728 - SOLID MILK AND THE METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meiji Co., Ltd. 2-1, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8306 / JP | [2017/17] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Meiji Co., Ltd. 1-2-10, Shinsuna Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBATA, Mitsuho c/o MEIJI Co. Ltd. R&D Div. 540 Naruda Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0862 / JP | 02 /
OHTSUBO, Kazumitsu c/o MEIJI Co. Ltd. R&D Div. 540 Naruda Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0862 / JP | 03 /
SATAKE, Yoshinori c/o MEIJI Co. Ltd. R&D Div. 540 Naruda Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0862 / JP | 04 /
KASHIWAGI, Kazunori c/o MEIJI Co. Ltd. R&D Div. 540 Naruda Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0862 / JP | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11795388.5 | 13.06.2011 | [2018/17] | WO2011JP03331 | Priority number, date | JP20100134612 | 13.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010134612 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158480 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2579728 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2579728 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/18, A23C9/16, A23P10/28, A23L33/00 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
A23C9/18 (EP,CN,US);
A23C9/16 (US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23P10/28 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | A23C9/18, A23C9/16, A23P1/02, A23L1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/16] | A23C9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFMILCH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/16] | English: | SOLID MILK AND THE METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2013/16] | French: | LAIT SOLIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18153051.0 / EP3338557 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2011 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | LU | 13.06.2018 | MT | 13.06.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.06.2011 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.06.2011 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3231386 (HUTTON JERRY T, et al) [X] 1-8,12,13 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 66; examples 1-3; claims 1-9 * [Y] 21; | [XY]WO2006072438 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 20 - page 12, line 7 * * page 16 * * claims 1-14 *[Y] 23; | [XY]EP1769682 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20,22 * the whole document * [Y] 21,23; | [XY]EP2090175 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20,22 * the whole document * [Y] 21,23 | International search | [A]EP1226759 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [X]WO2006004190 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006086130 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO2007077970 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP], et al); | [X]WO2008050473 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS49130189U | JPS61118280U | WO9520380 | JPH1112161 | JPH11349475 | JP4062357B |