EP2661560 - SYNTHETIC JET PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/06] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIK, Mehmet General Electric Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
GURSOY, Mustafa Mustafa Kemal Mah. 2136 Sok Ikizier Apt. No. 7/3 06520 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | 03 /
PETROSKI, James 2688 Sherwood Dr. Parma OH 44134 / US | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | [2020/06] |
Former [2013/46] | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11802228.4 | 06.12.2011 | [2020/06] | WO2011US63362 | Priority number, date | US20110984488 | 04.01.2011 Original published format: US 984488 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012094085 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661560 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661560 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/473, F04B43/00, F04B43/04, F04B45/047 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
F04B43/046 (EP,US);
B81B3/0018 (KR);
B81B3/0035 (KR);
F04B43/0027 (EP,US);
F04B45/047 (EP,US);
H01L23/467 (KR);
H01L23/4735 (EP,US);
H05K7/20 (KR);
B81B2201/03 (KR);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | F04B43/00, F04B43/04, F04B45/047, H01L23/467, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAPSELUNG VON SYNTHETISCHEN STRAHLDÜSEN | [2013/46] | English: | SYNTHETIC JET PACKAGING | [2013/46] | French: | ACTIONNEUR À JET SYNTHÉTIQUE | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2011 | AL | 05.02.2020 | AT | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | IT | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1515043 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0021] - [0055]; figure 6 *; | [XYI]US2005219288 (VOGELEY JIM [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,9,13,24,25 * paragraphs [0056] - [0061]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-26 [I] 6,8,10-12,26; | [Y]US2006056999 (EAST W J [US]) [Y] 1-26* paragraphs [0017] - [0049]; figures 1-6 *; | [XYI]EP1715519 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,13,24,25 * paragraphs [0008] - [0055]; figures 1-10 * [Y] 2-26 [I] 6,10-12,26; | [Y]EP1762725 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0035] - [0052]; figures 1-7 *; | [XYI]US2007139938 (PETROSKI JAMES T [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,13,24-26 * paragraphs [0035] - [0048]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-26 [I] 6,8-12; | [Y]US2008156462 (ARIK MEHMET [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0025] - [0026]; figures 9-11 *; | [XYI]US2009167109 (TOMITA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,13,24,25 * paragraphs [0064] - [0075]; figures 8,9 * [Y] 1-26 [I] 6,10-12,26 |