EP2592564 - SERVICE PROVISION DEVICE FOR ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS, SERVICE PROVISION METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS, AND SERVICE PROVISION TERMINAL FOR ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKI Kazunori c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11803523.7 | 01.07.2011 | WO2011JP65194 | Priority number, date | JP20100152917 | 05.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010152917 | [2013/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005189 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592564 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/21, G06F17/30 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
G06F40/171 (EP,US);
G06F3/0483 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | DIENSTBEREITSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE DOKUMENTE, DIENSTBEREITSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE DOKUMENTE UND DIENSTBEREITSTELLUNGSENDGERÄT FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE DOKUMENTE | [2013/20] | English: | SERVICE PROVISION DEVICE FOR ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS, SERVICE PROVISION METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS, AND SERVICE PROVISION TERMINAL FOR ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS | [2013/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICES POUR DOCUMENTS ÉLECTRONIQUES, PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICES POUR DOCUMENTS ÉLECTRONIQUES, ET TERMINAL DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICES POUR DOCUMENTS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2013 | Translation filed | 05.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 12.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2000348057 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2004240597 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) |