EP2592428 - POWER CONTROL DEVICE AND POWER CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Eiichiro c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
AVITABILE, Antonio c/o Sony United Kingdom Ltd. The Heights Brooklands Weybridge Surrey KT130XW / GB | 03 /
MARIELLA, Costantino c/o Sony United Kingdom Ltd. The Heights Brooklands Weybridge Surrey KT130XW / GB | 04 /
RUTHERFORD, Christopher c/o Sony Europe (Belgium) NV Da Vincilaan 7-D1 Zaventem B1935 / BE | 05 /
COLBY, Edward c/o Sentec Ltd. 61-69 Brunswick House Newmarket Road Cambridgeshire CB58EG / GB | 06 /
BAILEY, Nicholas c/o Sentec Ltd. 61-69 Brunswick House Newmarket Road Cambridgeshire CB58EG / GB | 07 /
KNILL, Alexander c/o Sentec Ltd. 61-69 Brunswick House Newmarket Road Cambridgeshire CB58EG / GB | 08 /
MEHTA, Harshul c/o Sentec Ltd. 61-69 Brunswick House Newmarket Road Cambridgeshire CB58EG / GB | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11803606.0 | 29.06.2011 | WO2011JP65408 | Priority number, date | JP20100156637 | 09.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010156637 | [2013/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005272 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592428 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R22/10, G06Q50/06, G01R22/06 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
G01R21/00 (US);
G01R22/063 (EP,US);
G01R22/10 (EP,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/26 (EP,US);
H02J2310/60 (EP);
H02J3/388 (EP,US);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | G01R22/00, G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSREGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LEISTUNGSREGELUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/20] | English: | POWER CONTROL DEVICE AND POWER CONTROL METHOD | [2013/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE L'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2012 | Translation filed | 12.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003101008 (HART RONALD G [CA]) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraph [0219] - paragraph [0292]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,4-6; | [A]US2008040263 (POLLACK SETH B [US], et al) [A] 1,7* abstract *; | [XI]US2009112758 (HERZIG MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * [I] 3; | [A]US2010017045 (NESLER CLAY G [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [E]EP2592740 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2009066742 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009261159 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD); | [Y]US2010007515 (ITO KEIGO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2009261159 |