EP2597486 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATION-BASED SERVICE FOR NAVIGATING INDOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Trade Network 159-1 Samseong-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-090 / KR | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute Of Science And Technology 373-1 Guseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-701 / KR | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Dong Soo Daedeok Techno Valley 409-1502 Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Min Kyu Nexus Valley B-1418 1369 Dunsan-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-830 / KR | 03 /
CHANG, Lae Young Daewoo Apt. 104-1202 Gyo-dong Gongju-si Chungcheongnam-do 314-090 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Hyun Il 1117-36 Pyeongni 2-dong Seo-gu Daegu 703-012 / KR | 05 /
LEE, In Je Jinheung Dubblepark 3-danji Apt. 307-704 Hoseongdong 2-ga Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 561-808 / KR | 06 /
MIN, Cheol Hong Jamsil els Apt. 160-802 Jamsil-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-910 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Dong Hee 201 1F 102-216 Hwagokbon-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-872 / KR | 08 /
LEE, Hwa Jin The-Sharp Starpark 103-2601 Jeongja 1-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-872 / KR | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11809817.7 | 08.07.2011 | WO2011KR05025 | Priority number, date | KR20110048107 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: KR 20110048107 | KR20110048102 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: KR 20110048102 | KR20110012537 | 11.02.2011 Original published format: KR 20110012537 | KR20110012530 | 11.02.2011 Original published format: KR 20110012530 | KR20100070554 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100070554 | [2013/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012011690 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597486 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,US);
G01S5/02524 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/22] | G01S19/12, G01S11/06, G01S5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR STANDORTBASIERTE DIENSTE ZUR INNENRAUMNAVIGATION | [2013/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATION-BASED SERVICE FOR NAVIGATING INDOORS | [2013/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN SERVICE BASÉ SUR L'EMPLACEMENT PERMETTANT DE NAVIGUER À L'INTÉRIEUR | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | Translation filed | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 11.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 20.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2017638 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010062790 (WIGREN TORBJOERN [SE]) [Y] 3-6,11 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0085]; figures 5-7 *; | [I]DE102008053176 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 1,9 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057]; figure 5 *; | [IY] - DAEHYUNG JO ET AL, Signal Dragging: Effects of Terminal Movement on War-Driving in CDMA/WCDMA Networks, LOCATION AND CONTEXT-AWARENESS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 211 - 227, (20070920), ISBN 978-3-540-75159-5, XP019072026 [I] 1,2,7-10,12-15 * Section 4.1 - 4.2; page 220 - page 222 * [Y] 3-6,11 | [A] - JINYOUNG HAN ET AL, "How to Mitigate Signal Dragging during Wardriving", IEEE PERVASIVE COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20100101), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1536-1268, pages 20 - 27, XP011298898 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20070118607 (SKYHOOK WIRELESS INC [US]); | [A]KR20080074971 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]KR20090008465 (SKYHOOK WIRELESS INC [US]); | [A]JP2009543074 (SKYHOOK WIRELESS, INC.) |