EP2601530 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING, DIAGNOSING, AND TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Virginia Patent Foundation 250 West Main Street, Suite 300 Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states University of Virginia Patent Foundation 250 West Main Street, Suite 300 Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERR, John C. 895 Old Ballard Road Charlottesville Virginia 22901 / US | 02 /
EUSEBIO S. Pires 106 University Gardens Apt. 4 Charlottesville Virginia 22903 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/24] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street GB-Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11815415.2 | 08.08.2011 | WO2011US46905 | Priority number, date | US201161499448P | 21.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161499448 P | US20100423302P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423302 P | US20100371215P | 06.08.2010 Original published format: US 371215 P | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012019184 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2601530 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68, A61K38/17 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/40 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/57442 (EP,US);
G01N33/57449 (EP,US);
G01N33/6884 (EP,US);
G01N33/689 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/24] | G01N33/574, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68, A61K38/17, A61K48/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG, DIAGNOSTIZIERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2013/24] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING, DIAGNOSING, AND TREATING CANCER | [2013/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À DÉTECTER, DIAGNOSTIQUER, ET TRAITER LE CANCER | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 31.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2014 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 03.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/49] | 12.07.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005108415 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16* page 260; sequences 587, 1733 *; | [X]US2010086948 (GOLD LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-16 * claim 1; table I *; | [XYI]WO2010054187 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [X] 7 * sequences 1-23 * [Y] 1-5,8-16 [I] 6; | [Y] - QUESADA V ET AL, "Identification and characterization of human and mouse ovastacin - A novel metalloproteinase similar to hatching enzymes from arthropods, birds, amphibians, and fish", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20040618), vol. 279, no. 25, doi:10.1074/JBC.M401588200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 26627 - 26634, XP002319604 [Y] 1-5,8-16 * page 26631, column l, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 * * page 26633, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 26633, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M401588200 | International search | [A]US2005214760 (CHAN DANIEL W [US], et al); | [A]US2009214552 (MANDAL ARABINDA [US], et al); | [A]US2010086948 (GOLD LARRY [US], et al); | [X]US2010183617 (HERR JOHN C [US], et al) | [A] - TONG Z. ET AL., "A Mouse Gene Encoding an Oocyte Antigen Associated with Autoi mmune Premature Ovarian Failure.", ENDOCRINOLOGY., (1999), vol. 140, no. 8, pages 3720 - 3726 | [A] - KURTH B.E. ET AL., "Immunogenicity of a multi-component recombinant human acro somal protein vaccine in female Macaca fascicularis.", J. REPRODUCTIVE IMMUNOL OGY., (2008), vol. 77, pages 126 - 141 |