EP2503218 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Naotaka c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KAWAGOE, Shinya c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
ENDO, Toshikazu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
ITOH, Kazuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
AMANO, Keiji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/38] |
Former [2012/39] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Naotaka / JP | ||
02 /
KAWAGOE, Shinya / JP | |||
03 /
ENDO, Toshikazu / JP | |||
04 /
ITOH, Kazuhiko / JP | |||
05 /
AMANO, Keiji / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11817259.2 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011JP04345 | Priority number, date | JP20110006413 | 14.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011006413 | [2012/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012095902 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2503218 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21Y101/02 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21V23/006 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2012/39] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2012/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE LUMINEUSE | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2012 | Translation filed | 20.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 10.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS58103188U ; | [X]JPH087639 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2009087950 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY, et al); | [Y]JP2009163954 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2010129414 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) | by applicant | JP2010212073 |