EP2606452 - REDUCING THE DIMENSIONALITY OF THE JOINT INVERSION PROBLEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 22777 Springwoods Village Parkway Spring TX 77389 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston TX 77098-2189 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLUR, Anoop, A. 2921 Briarpark Dr. 227 Houston TX 77042 / US | 02 /
WILLEN, Dennis, E. 1003 Loire Lane Houston TX 77070 / US | 03 /
SALTZER, Rebecca, L. 5811 Charlotte St. Houston TX 77005 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 11818509.9 | 27.06.2011 | WO2011US42026 | Priority number, date | US20100374135P | 16.08.2010 Original published format: US 374135 P | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012024025 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606452 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V11/00, G01V3/12, G01V3/18, G06G7/48 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (EP,US);
G01V3/12 (EP,US);
G01V3/18 (EP,US);
G01V2210/6163 (EP,US);
G01V2210/6165 (EP,US);
G01V2210/6222 (EP);
G01V2210/6224 (EP);
G01V2210/6226 (EP);
G01V2210/624 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | G06G7/48, G01V11/00, G01V3/12, G01V3/18, G06F17/50 | ||
Former IPC [2013/26] | G06G7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | REDUZIERUNG DER DIMENSIONALITÄT DES JOINT-INVERSION-PROBLEMS | [2013/26] | English: | REDUCING THE DIMENSIONALITY OF THE JOINT INVERSION PROBLEM | [2013/26] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA DIMENSIONNALITÉ DU PROBLÈME DE L'INVERSION CONJOINTE | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 23.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]USRE40321E (SRNKA LEONARD J [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 10, line 53 - line 58 * * column 12, line 60 - column 13, line 2 * * column 16, line 14 - line 37 *; | [Y]WO2007126481 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]US2009096457 (SRNKA LEONARD J [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]US6502037 (JORGENSEN GREGORY JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US2004122634 (CALVERT CRAIG S [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2009204327 (LU XINYOU [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * | [Y] - FERNANDO A MONTEIRO SANTOS ET AL, "1D joint inversion of AMT and resistivity data acquired over a graben", JOURNAL OF APLLIED GEOPHYSICS, (19971201), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 115 - 129, XP055388048 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [02.5] * * paragraph [04.1] - paragraph [04.3] * * paragraph [0005] * * figure 6 * | International search | [X]US2010185422 (HOVERSTEN GARY MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US2009119076 (MADATOV ARKADY G [RU], et al); | [A]US6424918 (JORGENSEN GREGORY JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]US2010004870 (TONELLOT THIERRY [FR], et al); | [A]US2006095239 (FRENKEL MICHAEL A [US]) |