EP2651912 - PHOTOCHROMIC COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transitions Optical, Inc. 9251 Belcher Road Pinellas Park, FL 33782 / US | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Meng 3153 Barberry Court Murrysville, Pennsylvania 15668 / US | 02 /
DABIDEEN, Darrin R. 2001 Gregory Street Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15203 / US | 03 /
DAI, Xiao-Man 3321 Carriage Circle Export, Pennsylvania 15632 / US | 04 /
XIAO, Wenjing 3142 Barberry Court Murrysville, Pennsylvania 15668 / US | 05 /
XU, Ruisong 5020 Impala Drive Murrysville, Pennsylvania 15668 / US | 06 /
MONDAL, Suijit 149 Lori Road Gibsonia, Pennsylvania 15044 / US | 07 /
KUMAR, Anil 2402 Oak Hurst Court Murrysville, Pennsylvania 15668 / US | 08 /
CHOPRA, Anu 1090 Balken Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11819037.0 | 08.12.2011 | [2018/40] | WO2011US63878 | Priority number, date | US20100459689P | 16.12.2010 Original published format: US 459689 P | US201113313178 | 07.12.2011 Original published format: US201113313178 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012082506 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651912 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651912 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/92, C07D311/94 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C07D311/92 (EP,US);
C07D311/78 (KR);
C07D311/94 (EP,CN,US);
G03F7/004 (CN);
G03F7/0041 (CN,KR);
G03F7/0047 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/43] | C07D311/26, C07D405/10, C07D407/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOTOCHROME VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/43] | English: | PHOTOCHROMIC COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS | [2013/43] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PHOTOCHROMIQUES | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 12.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 28.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Transitions Optical Limited IDA Industrial Estate Dunmore Road Tuam Galway / IE | Date: | 13.05.2016 | [2016/27] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2011 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | LU | 08.12.2018 | MT | 08.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.12.2011 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5645767 (VAN GEMERT BARRY [US]) [YD] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0119813 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [YD]US6296785 (NELSON CLARA M [US], et al) [YD] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004185255 (WALTERS ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 1-28* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005006035 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [YD]US2008103301 (CHOPRA ANU [US], et al) [YD] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2011140056 (HE MENG [US], et al) [XP] 1-28 * examples 5A, 9A, 10A, 13A, 15A, 16A and 18A * | by applicant | US4556605 | US4931220 | US5645767 | US5658501 | US5698141 | US5723072 | US5869658 | US5955520 | US5961892 | US5962617 | US6022497 | US6060001 | US6096375 | US6113814 | US6153126 | US6187444 | US6268055 | US6296785 | US6432544 | US6436525 | US6531076 | US6555028 | US6602603 | US6641874 | US6655028 | US6660727 | US6683709 | US2004068071 | US6736998 | US7008568 | US7166357 | US7256921 | US7262295 | US7320826 | US2008103301 | US7557208 | - HARRISON ET AL., Compendium of Organic Synthetic Methods, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1971), vol. 1-11 | - "Friede!-Crafts and Related Reactions", GEORGE A..OLAH, Aromatic Ketone Synthesis, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 3 | - ISHIHARA, REGIOSELECTIVE FRIEDEL-GRAFTS ACYLATION OF 1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE AND RELATED NITROGEN HETEROCYCLES: EFFECT ON NH PROTECTIVE GROUPS AND RING SIZE | - YUGI ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1992), vol. 1, pages 3401 - 3406 | - WANG, ADDITION OF GRIGNARD REAGENTS TO ARYL ACID CHLORIDES: AN EFFICIENT SYNTHESIS OF ARYL KETONES | - XIAO-JUN, ORGANIC LETTERS, (2005), vol. 7, no. 25, pages 5593 - 5595 | - SYNTHESIS, (199501), pages 41 - 43 | - THE JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY SOCIETY PERKIN TRANSACTION, (1995), vol. 1, pages 235 - 241 | - MYERS, ANDREW. G. ET AL., PRACTICAL PROCEDURES FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-TERT-BUTYLDIMETHYLSILYLHYDROZONES AND THEIR USE IN MODIFIED WOLFF-KISHNER REDUCTIONS AND IN THE SYNTHESIS OF VINYL HALIDES AND GEM-DIHALIDES, (2004), vol. 126, pages 5436 - 5445 | - "Photochromism", GLENN H. BROWN,, Techniques in Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (1971), vol. III |