EP2621532 - GENERATION, CHARACTERIZATION AND USES THEREOF OF ANTI-HER3 ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ningyan 315 Gentry Lane Ambler, PA 19002-3613 / US | 02 /
PRESTA, Leonard G. 301 S. California Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11829799.3 | 27.09.2011 | WO2011US53436 | Priority number, date | US20100388157P | 30.09.2010 Original published format: US 388157 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012044612 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621532 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/32 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG, KENNZEICHNUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN VON ANTI-HER3-ANTIKÖRPERN | [2013/32] | English: | GENERATION, CHARACTERIZATION AND USES THEREOF OF ANTI-HER3 ANTIBODIES | [2013/32] | French: | GÉNÉRATION, CARACTÉRISATION ET UTILISATIONS D'ANTICORPS ANTI-HER3 | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 10.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 10.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006183194 (BALLINGER ET AL) |