EP2637342 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/37] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2019/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyunwoo LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
CHUNG, Jaehoon LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Seunghee LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/37] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstraße 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11838234.0 | 02.11.2011 | [2020/21] | WO2011KR08294 | Priority number, date | US201161481257P | 02.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161481257 P | US201161450140P | 08.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161450140 P | US20100412794P | 12.11.2010 Original published format: US 412794 P | US20100412362P | 10.11.2010 Original published format: US 412362 P | US20100410349P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 410349 P | US20100409994P | 04.11.2010 Original published format: US 409994 P | US20100409547P | 03.11.2010 Original published format: US 409547 P | US20100409485P | 02.11.2010 Original published format: US 409485 P | [2013/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012060629 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2637342 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2637342 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L27/26, H04B7/26, H04W72/04, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04L5/14, H04W36/00 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H04L1/1671 (KR);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L27/2636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L5/22 (KR);
H04W36/0072 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/04 (US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/12 (KR);
H04W72/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/37] | H04L1/16, H04L27/26, H04B7/26, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON UPLINK-STEUERINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2019/47] |
Former [2013/37] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN/EMPFANGEN VON UPLINK-STEUERINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2013/37] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2013/37] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION/RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2013 | Translation filed | 15.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2011 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | IE | 02.11.2020 | LU | 02.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 02.11.2011 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MK | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.11.2011 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 9)", (20100917), 3GPP DRAFT; 36213-930, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/2014-12/Rel-9/36_series/, (20100917), XP050912599 [X] 1-5,10,11 * section 7.3 * * section 10.1 * | [IP] - LG ELECTRONICS, "ACK/NACK on PUCCH for TDD", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-106099, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101111), vol. RAN WG1, no. Jacksonville, USA; 20101115, XP050468443 [IP] 1-11 * section 4 * * section 5 * | International search | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "PUCCH resources for multi-bit ACK", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62BIS, R1-105557, (20101011), XP050450657 | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "ACK/NACK on PUCCH for TDD", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62BIS, R1-105647, (20101011), XP050450756 | [A] - CATT, "Resource Allocation for PUCCH Format 3", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62BIS, R1-105153, (20101011), XP050450371 | [A] - SAMSUNG, "HARQ-ACK Resource Indication in PUCCH for DL CA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62BIS, R1-105359, (20101011), XP050450510 |