EP2635295 - CONTROL AND CHARACTERIZATION OF MEMORY FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford CA 94305-2038 / US | [2017/51] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 3th Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states The Board Of Trustees Of The University Of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEISSEROTH, Karl 70 Peter Coutts Circle Palo Alto CA 94305 / US | 02 /
GOSHEN, Inbal 773 Los Robles Ave. Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/51] |
Former [2013/37] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11838856.0 | 04.11.2011 | [2017/51] | WO2011US59283 | Priority number, date | US20100410732P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 410732 P | US201161540926P | 29.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161540926 P | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012061681 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635295 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2635295 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,CN,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG UND CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON SPEICHERFUNKTIONEN | [2013/37] | English: | CONTROL AND CHARACTERIZATION OF MEMORY FUNCTION | [2013/37] | French: | CONTRÔLE ET CARACTÉRISATION DE LA FONCTION MÉMOIRE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 20.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2011 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2010056970 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18; | [XY] - V. GRADINARU ET AL, "Optical Deconstruction of Parkinsonian Neural Circuitry", SCIENCE, (20090417), vol. 324, no. 5925, doi:10.1126/science.1167093, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 354 - 359, XP055108177 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1167093 | [XY] - ZHANG FENG ET AL, "Multimodal fast optical interrogation of neural circuitry", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20070405), vol. 446, no. 7136, doi:10.1038/NATURE05744, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 633 - 639, XP002487911 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature05744 | [Y] - MAYFORD M ET AL, "CONTROL OF MEMORY FORMATION THROUGH REGULATED EXPRESSION OF A CAMKII TRANSGENE", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, (19960101), vol. 274, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.274.5293.1678, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1678 - 1683, XP002916702 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.274.5293.1678 | [Y] - MALIN ET AL, "Involvement of the rostral anterior cingulate cortex in consolidation of inhibitory avoidance memory: Interaction with the basolateral amygdala", NEUROBIOLOGY OF LEARNING AND MEMORY, SAN DIEGO, US, (20070107), vol. 87, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.NLM.2006.09.004, ISSN 1074-7427, pages 295 - 302, XP005734137 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nlm.2006.09.004 | [Y] - FIALA A ET AL, "Optogenetic Approaches in Neuroscience", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, GB, vol. 20, no. 20, doi:10.1016/J.CUB.2010.08.053, ISSN 0960-9822, (20101026), pages R897 - R903, (20101026), XP027452520 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2010.08.053 | [Y] - XU LIU ET AL, "Optogenetics 3.0", CELL, (20100401), vol. 141, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2010.03.019, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 22 - 24, XP055107914 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2010.03.019 | [Y] - VIVIANA GRADINARU ET AL, "Molecular and Cellular Approaches for Diversifying and Extending Optogenetics", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20100402), vol. 141, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2010.02.037, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 154 - 165, XP002704864 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CELL.2010.02.037 | [A] - SCHROLL C ET AL, "Light-Induced Activation of Distinct Modulatory Neurons Triggers Appetitive or Aversive Learning in Drosophila Larvae", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, GB, vol. 16, no. 17, ISSN 0960-9822, (20060905), pages 1741 - 1747, (20060905), XP027967925 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2009093403 (ZHANG FENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2009088680 (ARAVANIS ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [Y]US2008227139 (DEISSEROTH KARL [US], et al); | [Y] - MALIN E.L. ET AL., "Involvement of the Rostral Anterior Cingulate Cortex in Consolidation of Inhibitory Avoidance Memory: Interaction with the Basolateral Amygdala.", NEUROBIOL LEARN MEM., (2007), vol. 87, no. 2, pages 295 - 302, XP005734137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nlm.2006.09.004 | [A] - GRADINARU ET AL., "Molecular and Cellular Approaches for Diversifying and Extending Optogenetics.", CELL, (20100402), vol. 141, pages 1 - 12, XP002704864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CELL.2010.02.037 | [P] - GOSHEN I. ET AL., "Dynamics of Retrieval Strategies for Remote Memories", CELL, (20111028), vol. 147, pages 678 - 689, XP028330391 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2011.09.033 | Examination | - OFER YIZHAR ET AL, "Optogenetics in Neural Systems", NEURON, vol. 71, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.NEURON.2011.06.004, ISSN 0896-6273, (20110714), pages 9 - 34, (20110610), XP028379910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2011.06.004 | - Joshua P. Johansen ET AL, "Optical activation of lateral amygdala pyramidal cells instructs associative fear learning", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, US, (20100625), vol. 107, no. 28, doi:10.1073/pnas.1002418107, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12692 - 12697, XP055283874 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1002418107 | - Michael S Fanselow ET AL, "Why We Think Plasticity Underlying Viewpoint Pavlovian Fear Conditioning Occurs in the Basolateral Amygdala in the ABL is temporarily disrupted only during learning. Each of these conditions has been satisfied. Destruction of the ABL before Training Prevents Learning Lesions of the amygdala produce", Neuron, (19990601), vol. 23, pages 229 - 232, XP055302219 | - ROGERS J L ET AL, "Effects of ventral and dorsal CA1 subregional lesions on trace fear conditioning", NEUROBIOLOGY OF LEARNING AND MEMORY, SAN DIEGO, US, vol. 86, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.NLM.2006.01.002, ISSN 1074-7427, (20060701), pages 72 - 81, (20060701), XP024917504 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nlm.2006.01.002 | - MASANORI SAKAGUCHI ET AL, "Catching the engram: strategies to examine the memory trace", MOLECULAR BRAIN, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20120921), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-6606-5-32, ISSN 1756-6606, page 32, XP021108216 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-6606-5-32 | - CAITLIN A. ORSINI ET AL, "Neural and cellular mechanisms of fear and extinction memory formation", NEUROSCIENCE AND BIOBEHAVIORAL REVIEWS., XX, (20120801), vol. 36, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.neubiorev.2011.12.014, ISSN 0149-7634, pages 1773 - 1802, XP055381541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neubiorev.2011.12.014 | - CLARA TOURI?O ET AL, "Optogenetics in psychiatric diseases", CURRENT OPINION IN NEUROBIOLOGY., GB, (20130601), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.conb.2013.03.007, ISSN 0959-4388, pages 430 - 435, XP055381544 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.conb.2013.03.007 | - NIEH EDWARD H ET AL, "Optogenetic dissection of neural circuits underlying emotional valence and motivated behaviors", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20121108), vol. 1511, doi:10.1016/J.BRAINRES.2012.11.001, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 73 - 92, XP028583667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2012.11.001 | by applicant | WO2010056970 | US2009093403 | US2009088680 | US6596535 | - GRADINARU et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 324, pages 354 - 359 | - FIALA et al., Current Biology, (20100000), vol. 20, pages R897 - R903 | - MALIN et al., Neurobiol Learn Mem., (20070000), vol. 87, no. 2, pages 295 - 302 | - JOHANSEN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 12692 - 12697 | - FANSELOW; LEDOUX, Neuron, (19990000), vol. 23, pages 229 - 232 | - ROGERS et al., Neurobiology of Learning and Memory, (20060000), vol. 86, pages 72 - 81 |