EP2642292 - METHOD FOR TESTING FOR CEREBRAL INFARCTION VIA CARTILAGE ACIDIC PROTEIN 1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | For all designated states Kyushu University, National University Corporation 10-1, Hakozaki 6-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | For all designated states Hisayama Research Institute For Lifestyle Diseases 1822-1, Oaza Kubara Hisayama-machi Kasuya-gun, Fukuoka 811-2501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hisayama Research Institute For Lifestyle Diseases 1822-1, Oaza Kubara Hisayama-machi Kasuya-gun, Fukuoka 811-2501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZONO, Takanari c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | 02 /
KAMOUCHI, Masahiro c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | 03 /
AGOU, Tetsurou c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | 04 /
KUWASHIRO, Takahiro c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | 05 /
KIYOHARA, Yutaka c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | 06 /
HATA, Jun c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | 07 /
AWANO, Hideto c/o Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-6-18, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | 08 /
KOBAYASHI, Teruaki c/o Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 3-16-89, Kashima Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-8505 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11841158.6 | 16.11.2011 | WO2011JP76415 | Priority number, date | JP20100255932 | 16.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010255932 | [2013/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012067151 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642292 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (KR);
G01N33/15 (KR);
G01N33/50 (KR);
G01N33/53 (KR);
G01N2800/2871 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | TESTVERFAHREN AUF HIRNINFARKTE MITHILFE DES SAUREN KNORPELPROTEINS 1 | [2013/39] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING FOR CEREBRAL INFARCTION VIA CARTILAGE ACIDIC PROTEIN 1 | [2013/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESSAI POUR UN INFARCTUS CÉRÉBRAL PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DE LA PROTÉINE 1 ACIDE DU CARTILAGE | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2013 | Translation filed | 13.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 18.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2593566 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [E] 1,3,12 * claims 1, 39, 42 * * table 8, p. 101 * * par. 11, 33, 165 *; | [A] - J. D. EASTON ET AL, "Definition and Evaluation of Transient Ischemic Attack: A Scientific Statement for Healthcare Professionals From the American Heart Association/American Stroke Association Stroke Council; Council on Cardiovascular Surgery and Anesthesia; Council on Cardiovascular Radiology and Intervention; Council", STROKE, (20090601), vol. 40, no. 6, doi:10.1161/STROKEAHA.108.192218, ISSN 0039-2499, pages 2276 - 2293, XP055111051 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/STROKEAHA.108.192218 | [A] - WANG ET AL, "Genome-wide transcriptome profiling of region-specific vulnerability to oxidative stress in the hippocampus", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (20070710), vol. 90, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YGENO.2007.03.007, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 201 - 212, XP022146433 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygeno.2007.03.007 | International search | [X]US2010081136 (GOLZ STEFAN [DE], et al); | [A]JP2010523124 (GENZYME CORP.) | by applicant | US2010081136 | - LEE, L. J. ET AL., STROKE, (2000), pages 1081 - 1089 | - MONTANER ET AL., STROKE, (2008), pages 2280 - 2287 | - VAN SWIETEN, J. C ET AL., STROKE, (1988), pages 604 - 607 | - MAHONEY, F. L ET AL., MARYLAND STATE MED J, (1965), pages 61 - 65 | - SHIBAZAKI, K ET AL., INTER MED, (2009), pages 1601 - 1604 | - BROTT T. ET AL., STROKE, (1989), vol. 20, page 864 | - New Biochemistry Experiments Lecture, TOKYO KAGAKU-DOJIN | - Clinical Test Handbook, KANEHARA & CO., LTD. | - YUKITO SHINOHARA ET AL., "mRS Reliability Study Group, Reliability of modified Rankin Scale-Introduction of a guidance scheme and a questionnaire written in Japanese", JPN J STROKE, (2007), vol. 29, pages 6 - L3 | - BROTT T. ET AL., "Measurement of acute cerebral infarction: A clinical examination scale", STROKE, (1989), vol. 20, page 864 | - YUJI KUGE; AZUO MINEMATSU ET AL., "Nylon Monofilament for Intraluminal Middle Cerebral Artery Occlusionin Rats", STROKE, (1995), vol. 26, page 1655 | - YUKITO SHINOHARA ET AL., "mRS Reliability Study Group, Reliability of modified Rankin Scale- Introduction of a guidance scheme and a questionnaire written in Japanese", JPN J STROKE, (2007), vol. 29, pages 6 - 13 |