EP2668820 - TEMPERATURE SENSING AND HEATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluechiip Pty Ltd Office 10b, MiniFAB 1 Dalmore Drive Caribbean Park Scoresby, Victoria 3179 / AU | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAFFEY, Jason, Phillip 2/168 Holland Road Blackburn South, Victoria 3130 / AU | 02 /
MILJANIC, Miroslav 3 Pearson Street Dandenong North, Victoria 3175 / AU | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Heebøll-Nielsen, Anders, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 11857412.8 | 22.12.2011 | WO2011AU01661 | Priority number, date | AU20110900278 | 28.01.2011 Original published format: AU 2011900278 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012100281 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668820 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/10, H05B6/36 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
H05B6/06 (EP,US);
H05B2213/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURMESSUNG UND HEIZVORRICHTUNG | [2013/49] | English: | TEMPERATURE SENSING AND HEATING DEVICE | [2013/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE TEMPÉRATURE ET DE CHAUFFAGE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 21.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 24.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1212925 (THERMAL SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,6-8,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0017] , [0020] , [0023] - [0027] - [0153] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2004144683 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2-5,13,14 * abstract *; | [X]US2007092670 (QUELLA JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,12 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0023] , [0027] , [0039] *; | [XY]US7557708 (PACHOLOK DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,10-13,15 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 1, lines 31-53 * * column 3, lines 21-46 * * column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 8 * * claims 1,4-7 * [Y] 2-5,13,14; | [A]WO2010037166 (BLUECHIIP PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 26 * | International search | [X]US6316753 (CLOTHIER BRIAN L [US], et al); | [Y]US2001045427 (THOMPSON LESLIE L [US], et al); | [A]JP2004144683 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |