EP2785058 - VIDEO ADVERTISEMENT BROADCASTING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Isarpatent Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11867149.4 | 23.11.2011 | WO2011CN82747 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012167568 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785058 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/52, H04N21/44 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US);
H04N21/4394 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | H04N7/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR RUNDSENDUNG VON VIDEOWERBUNGEN | [2014/40] | English: | VIDEO ADVERTISEMENT BROADCASTING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2014/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE RADIODIFFUSION DE PUBLICITÉS VIDÉO | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2014 | Translation filed | 03.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 28.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2016 | 10.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2017/18] | 31.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6044376 (KURTZMAN II STEPHEN J [US]) [I] 1-5,7-12,14-17 * column 2, line 1 - line 29; figure - * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 25; claim - * [A] 6,13; | [A]EP2045729 (BLINKX UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [X]CN1582444 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [A]CN101046871 (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101072340 (MENG ZHIPING [CN]); | [A]CN101179739 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) |