EP2743150 - VEHICLE, VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD AND VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Keita c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2014/25] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 11870742.1 | 08.08.2011 | [2016/21] | WO2011JP68045 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013021446 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2743150 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2743150 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/06, B60K6/445, B60W10/26, B60W20/00 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
B60K6/445 (EP,CN,US);
B60W50/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/14 (US);
B60W10/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,CN);
B60W20/13 (EP,US);
B60W20/40 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2710/244 (EP,CN,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,CN,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNG | [2014/25] | English: | VEHICLE, VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD AND VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE | [2014/25] | French: | VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2014 | Translation filed | 03.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2011 | AL | 25.05.2016 | AT | 25.05.2016 | BE | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IS | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | IE | 08.08.2016 | LU | 08.08.2016 | GB | 25.08.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 08.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1077149 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0066] , [0084] * * figures 4A,4B *; | [A]JP2006077641 (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0056] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2008029320 (FLECKNER MARCO [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040] *; | [A]JP2008247252 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]JP2009018743 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0038] * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]JP2009018743 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2009220765 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2002262401 |