EP2757026 - VEHICLE ROOF STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDA, Kazunori c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
MIZOHATA, Hitoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/30] | Feller, Frank, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11872278.4 | 12.09.2011 | [2016/33] | WO2011JP70692 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013038466 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757026 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2757026 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/06, B62D25/02, B62D27/02 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
B62D27/026 (EP,US);
B62D25/02 (EP,US);
B62D25/06 (EP,US);
B62D27/02 (US);
B62D25/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/30] | B62D25/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGDACHAUFBAU | [2014/30] | English: | VEHICLE ROOF STRUCTURE | [2014/30] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TOIT DE VÉHICULE | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2014 | Translation filed | 17.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 24.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2011 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 12.09.2016 | LU | 12.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | FR | 17.10.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GB | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 12.09.2011 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.09.2011 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.09.2011 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1845013 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1580098 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO2011001510 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2004306676 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2003341547 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPH01201495 (NISSAN SHATAI CO); | [Y]JPS63109267U (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP., NIPPON JIDOSHA ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA); | [Y]JPH06239266 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11180339 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XE]JP2011195106 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [XE]JP2011195105 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | US6027160 |