EP2526807 - Storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stickel, Emma Rebhalde 5a 88682 Salem / DE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstr. 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12004074.6 | 25.05.2012 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | DE201110102558 | 26.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011102558 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2526807 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A45C9/00, A45C13/02 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
A45C15/00 (EP);
A45C13/02 (EP);
A45C13/03 (EP);
A45C15/04 (EP);
A45C7/0045 (EP);
A45C9/00 (EP);
A45C2009/002 (EP);
A45C2011/002 (EP);
A45C2011/003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungsvorrichtung | [2012/48] | English: | Storage device | [2012/48] | French: | Dispositif de stockage | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005145458 (COHEN LOUIS B [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-16 * [I] 4; | [XI]US1520044 (WILT CHARLES T) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 92 - page 2, line 62; figures 1-4 * [I] 4-6,8,9; | [X]DE202009008927U (MEYER WALTER LEO [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 32] , [0 33]; figure 1 *; | [X]US5159999 (VOIGT BERNARD [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2011056788 (JACKSON VALERIE D [US]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1-4 * |