EP2711348 - Method and device for producing ethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göke, Volker St. Hubertusstr. 13b 82538 Geretsried / DE | 02 /
Schmigalle, Holger Jahnstraße 38 82538 Geretsried / DE | 03 /
Thaller, Christian Mitterhoferstraße 18 80687 München / DE | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 12008169.0 | 06.12.2012 | [2014/13] | Priority number, date | DE20121018602 | 20.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012018602 | [2014/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2711348 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2711348 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/84, C07C4/04, C07C5/327, C07C11/04, C01B3/38 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
C07C2/84 (EP,US);
B01J19/2445 (US);
C01B3/382 (EP,US);
C07C4/04 (EP,US);
C07C5/327 (EP,US);
C10G9/36 (EP,US);
B01J2219/24 (US);
C01B2203/0216 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/043 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1247 (EP,US);
C01B2203/141 (EP,US);
C01B2203/146 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1044 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/84, C07C11/04 (EP,US);
C07C4/04, C07C11/04 (US,EP);
C07C5/327, C07C11/04 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | C07C2/84, C07C4/04, C07C5/327, C07C11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anlage und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ethylen | [2014/13] | English: | Method and device for producing ethylene | [2014/13] | French: | Installation et procédé destinés à la fabrication d'éthylène | [2014/13] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 10.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2012 | AL | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | IT | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | MT | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | RS | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | IE | 06.12.2015 | LU | 06.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1543156 (LUMMUS CO) [A] 1,7* claim 1 *; | [A]DE3237079 (BAERNS MANFRED PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4333372 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT], et al) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 * * page 4, lines 34-35 *; | [A]NL9300168 (UNIV TWENTE, et al) [A] 1,7 * page 1, lines 1-10,19 * * page 2, lines 4-15 * * page 3, lines 7-10 * * page 4, lines 5-14 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2007045364 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * claims 1,2 * |