EP2572626 - CAPSULE TYPE ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | Imaging device for endoscope and capsule type endoscope | ||
[2015/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimori, Noriyuki 2575, Konami Suwa-shi, Nagano, 3920131 / JP | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/13] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12008560.0 | 18.01.2005 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | JP20040010712 | 19.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004010712 | JP20040014620 | 22.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004014620 | JP20040017138 | 26.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004017138 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2572626 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572626 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/05, H05K1/18 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
A61B1/051 (EP,US);
A61B1/00032 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/00188 (EP,US);
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
H05K1/144 (EP,US);
H05K1/147 (EP,US);
H05K1/148 (EP,US);
H05K2201/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/13] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP VOM KAPSELTYP | [2015/41] | English: | CAPSULE TYPE ENDOSCOPE | [2015/41] | French: | ENDOSCOPE DU TYPE CAPSULE | [2015/42] |
Former [2013/13] | Bildgebende vorrichtung für ein Endoskop und Endoskop vom Kapseltyp | ||
Former [2013/13] | Imaging device for endoscope and capsule type endoscope | ||
Former [2013/13] | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE POUR ENDOSCOPE ET ENDOSCOPE A CAPSULE | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05703783.0 / EP1707103 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050703783) is 14.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001231744 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]JP2003210394 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1702555 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0 27] - [0029] - [0 34] - [0035] * * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | JP2001091860 |