EP2489489 - Device for producing granulates from polymeric materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coperion GmbH Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stark, Dr. Bernhard Messhausen 30 88273 Fronreute / DE | 02 /
Ahlgrimm, Michael Beim Wurmberg 2 74354 Besigheim / DE | 03 /
Nicklas, Markus Dieselstraße 12 69226 Nußloch / DE | 04 /
Hustert, Olaf Thumbstraße 103 88250 Weingarten / DE | 05 /
Dürr, Dipl.-Ing. Michael Hochgratstraße 8 88364 Wolfegg / DE | 06 /
Dehm, Günther Habsburgweg 4 88369 Bergatreute / DE | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12151479.8 | 18.01.2012 | [2012/34] | Priority number, date | DE20111004429 | 18.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011004429 | [2012/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489489 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/06, B29B9/16 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
F28D21/0001 (EP,US);
B29B7/007 (EP);
B29B7/826 (EP);
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP);
B29C48/05 (EP);
B29C48/276 (EP);
B29C48/911 (EP);
F01K25/10 (EP,US);
F22B1/16 (EP,US);
F28F27/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP);
B29C48/919 (EP);
F28D2021/0045 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Granulaten aus polymeren Werkstoffen | [2012/34] | English: | Device for producing granulates from polymeric materials | [2012/34] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de granulés en matières premières polymères | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP12194161.1 / EP2567800 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1117514 (UTILISATION DES COMBUSTIBLES S) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, column 1, line 20 - line 27 * * page 3, column 2, line 32 - page 4, column 1, line 26 * * figures 10-15 *; | [Y]DE102005048795 (KOEHLER & ZIEGLER ANLAGENTECHN [DE]) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0018] - [0021] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1842646 (ECON GMBH [AT]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]WO2007131613 (RIETER AUTOMATIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 9-15 * page 5, line 10 - line 16 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 16 * * page 14, line 30 - page 16, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2033753 (LURGI ZIMMER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0072] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2159526 (COPERION GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,15 * paragraph [0048] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102008062480 (AUTOMATIK PLASTICS MACHINERY [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2010263842 (AST GABOR [DE], et al) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0011] - [0016] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010281865 (LEHAR MATTHEW ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0008] , [0018] , [0019] ** figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0444338 | DE4337205 | DE19824788 | DE10061892 | EP1522395 | DE102008023046 |