EP2478839 - Method and apparatus for detecting respiratory effort [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2019/34] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states ResMed Limited 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armistead, Jeffrey Peter 5/4 Riley Street North Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU | 02 /
Richards, Glenn 380 Ness Valley Road Clevedon Auckland / NZ | 03 /
Wells, Alicia Kristianne 4/4 Narrabeen Street Narrabeen, New South Wales 2101 / AU | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2012/30] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12152468.0 | 25.01.2012 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | US201161436020P | 25.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161436020 P | US201213352758 | 18.01.2012 Original published format: US201213352758 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478839 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2478839 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/113, A61B5/00, A61B5/08, A61M16/00, A61M16/06 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
A61B5/0826 (EP,US);
A61B5/113 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
A61M16/0051 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0633 (EP,US);
A61M16/0683 (EP,US);
A61M16/0069 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/332 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | A61B5/113, A61B5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2012/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Detektion von Atmungsanstrengungen | [2012/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for detecting respiratory effort | [2012/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour détecter un effort respiratoire | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2012 | AL | 05.12.2018 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | IE | 25.01.2019 | LU | 25.01.2019 | MT | 25.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | FR | 05.02.2019 | BG | 05.03.2019 | GB | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | DE | 01.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 25.01.2012 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 25.01.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
MT | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GB | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 25.01.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
MT | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GB | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 25.01.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
MT | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GB | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 25.01.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GB | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 25.01.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GB | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
IE | 25.01.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
FR | 05.02.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 25.01.2019 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010240982 (WESTBROOK PHILIP R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,23,25-27,29,37,40-43 * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0033] - [0042] - [0049] , [0053] , [0090] - [0094]; figures 1-3,10-12; claims 16-17 *; | [XY]US2002161308 (MATSUMURA FUMIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,23,28 * paragraphs [0081] - [0082]; figure 9 * [Y] 16-22,37-43; | [X]US2007208269 (MUMFORD JOHN R [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,11-15,23-25,29,32-36,42-50 * paragraphs [0058] - [0061] - [0066] , [0075] - [0076] - [0080] - [0082] - [0084] - [0085] - [0093] - [0094] - [ 102] , [0175] , [0195] , [ 208] - paragraphs [0211] , [ 218] , [ 222] - [0224]; figures 1,5-6 *; | [X]US4860766 (SACKNER MARVIN A [US]) [X] 1,7-10,23,28-31 * column 5, line 54 - column 7, line 18 * * column 9, lines 2-22; figures 1-5; claim 9 *; | [X]WO2010103435 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 23-25 * page 9, line 23 - page 13, line 33; figures 1-2 *; | [X]US2005074741 (LEE KENT [US], et al) [X] 23-27,32-45 * paragraphs [0075] - [0090] - [0116] - [0125]; figures 17-18; table I *; | [Y]US6840907 (BRYDON JOHN WILLIAM ERNEST [AU]) [Y] 16-22,37-43 * column 23, line 35 - column 24, line 65; figures 2,19 * * column 19, line 4 - column 20, line 65 * * column 11, line 1 - column 13, line 66 * * column 6, lines 32-67 * | Examination | US2010147304 | US4836219 | by applicant | US5199424 | US6675797 | US7730886 | US20100781070 | WO2010AU00894 |