EP2620465 - Heat-treatment of water-absorbing polymeric particles in a fluidized bed at a fast heat-up rate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gartner, Herbert Rebgasse 15 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | 02 /
Hager, Marc 3A place Schuman 67500 Haguenau / FR | 03 /
Plöchinger, Harald Riedboschweg 12 77815 Bühl / DE | 04 /
Auernig, Sabine Gehrengrabenstr. 21a 77886 Lauf / DE | 05 /
Kohler, Hans-Peter Hans-Jakobweg 23a 77830 Bühlertal / DE | 06 /
Lacker, Elisabeth Flösserstr. 2 77815 Rheinau-Freistett / DE | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 12152795.6 | 27.01.2012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620465 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2620465 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2620465 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08J3/12, A61L15/60, B29B9/16 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
F26B3/00 (US);
C08J3/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/124 (EP,US);
B29B2009/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmebehandlung von wasserabsorbierenden Polymerpartikeln in einem Wirbelbett bei hoher Aufheizrate | [2013/31] | English: | Heat-treatment of water-absorbing polymeric particles in a fluidized bed at a fast heat-up rate | [2013/31] | French: | Traitement thermique de particules polymères absorbant l'eau dans un lit fluidisé à une vitesse de chauffage rapide | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 30.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.2015
18.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0043 / JP Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.2015
18.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0043 / JP Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | 15.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.06.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.02.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2012 | AL | 10.09.2014 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | IT | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | RS | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | SM | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | IE | 27.01.2015 | LU | 27.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | GB | 27.01.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MK | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006082241 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2010099799 (FRICKER DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4020780 | WO9420547 | US5559335 | US5562646 | EP0979250 | WO2006082241 | WO2007074108 | EP20100003452 |