EP2469398 - Selecting of text using gestures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westerman, Wayne Carl 260 King Street, Apt. 1507 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
Ording, Bas 44 Newburg Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
Victor, Michael B. 2010 Sand Hill Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
Lemay, Stephen O. 1121 Lincoln Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
Westerman, Wayne Carl 260 King Street, Apt. 1507 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | ||
02 /
Ording, Bas 44 Newburg Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
03 /
Victor, Michael B. 2010 Sand Hill Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
Lemay, Stephen O. 735 Kirkham Street San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | Representative(s) | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/26] | Howell, Matthew Dafydd Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12154861.4 | 04.03.2009 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | US20080042313 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: US 42313 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2469398 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2469398 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469398 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F17/24, G06F17/21, G06F3/0488, G06K9/20 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F40/166 (EP,US);
G06V30/1456 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | G06F3/048, G06F17/24, G06F17/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | Auswahl von Text durch Gesten | [2012/26] | English: | Selecting of text using gestures | [2012/26] | French: | Sélection de texte à l'aide de gestes | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09154312.4 / EP2098947 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090154312) is 05.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2009 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | GB | 04.03.2020 | IE | 04.03.2020 | LU | 04.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | FR | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.03.2009 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
GB | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
GB | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NO | 10.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006026521 (HOTELLING STEVE [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0013] , [0025] , [0059] - [0061] - [0064] , [0065] , [0085] *; | [YA]US2007157085 (PETERS JOHAN C [NL]) [Y] 4,9,14 * abstract * * figures 1,3-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] *[A] 5,10,15; | [Y] - Jason Kottke ET AL, "New iPhone features", web archive capture of weblog entry & comments, Internet Archive Wayback Machine, (20070705), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070705203857/http://www.kottke.org/07/07/new-iphone-features, (20130930), XP055081696 [Y] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * New iPhone Features blog post on July 1m 2007 at 10:21 pm (p. 1). * * Comments by Brent Royal-Gordon on July 3, 2007 at 3:37 am and Philip Flip Kromer (both on p. 15). * | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20060459606 | US20060459615 | US20070965570 |