EP2486897 - Closed loop brain machine interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University Office of Science and Technology P.O. Box 90083 Durham, NC 27708-0083 / US | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolelis, Miguel, A.L. 1000 Staffield Lane Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 02 /
Chapin, John, K. 1980 Bay Blvd Atlantic Beach, New York 11509 / US | 03 /
Wessberg, Johan Skytteskogsgatan 33 41476 Göteborg / SE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12156889.3 | 01.10.2002 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | US20010012012 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: US 12012 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2486897 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2486897 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2486897 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0478, A61B5/04, G06F3/01, // A61F2/70, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B5/0482, A61F2/72 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (EP);
A61B5/293 (US);
A61B5/72 (EP,US);
G06F3/015 (EP,US);
A61B2503/40 (EP,US);
A61B2503/42 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B5/1114 (EP,US);
A61B5/375 (EP,US);
A61B5/6868 (EP,US);
A61B5/7221 (EP,US);
A61B5/7455 (EP,US);
A61F2/72 (EP,US);
A61F2002/704 (EP,US);
Y10S128/905 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | A61F4/00, G06F3/01, A61B5/04, A61B5/0478 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2019/18] |
Former [2012/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehirn-Maschine-Schnittstelle mit geschlossener Schleife | [2012/33] | English: | Closed loop brain machine interface | [2012/33] | French: | Interface de machine cérébrale en boucle fermée | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02782089.3 / EP1448121 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020782089) is 17.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 15   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | GB | 01.10.2019 | IE | 01.10.2019 | LU | 01.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/48] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
GB | 01.10.2019 | ||
IE | 01.10.2019 | ||
LU | 01.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 01.10.2019 | ||
LU | 01.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 01.05.2019 | |
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5037376 (RICHMOND BARRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 42 *; | [YD]US6171239 (HUMPHREY DONALD R [US]) [YD] 1,4-15 * column 7, line 14 - column 9, line 9 * * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 42 * * column 12, line 31 - column 15, line 45; figures 1,2,4-6,10-14 *; | [YA] - CHAPIN J K ET AL, "Real-time control of a robot arm using simultaneously recorded neurons in the motor cortex", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, NATURE AMERICA, INC, US, (19990701), vol. 2, no. 7, doi:10.1038/10223, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 664 - 670, XP002635430 [Y] 1-3,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 4-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/10223 | [Y] - MOXON K A, "Brain-control interfaces for sensory and motor prosthetic devices", 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). SALT LAKE CITY, UT, MAY 7 - 11, 2001; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010507), vol. 6, ISBN 978-0-7803-7041-8, pages 3445 - 3448, XP010803259 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940582 | [AD] - WESSBERG J ET AL, ""Real-time prediction of hand trajectory by ensembles of cortical neurons in primates"", NATURE, (20001116), vol. 408, no. 6810, doi:10.1038/35042582, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 361 - 365, XP055034532 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35042582 | by applicant | US4808187 | US5336269 | US6171239 | - NICOLELIS ET AL., NATURE NEUROSCI., (1998), vol. 1, pages 621 - 630 | - LAUBACH ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 405, pages 567 - 571 | - NICOLELIS ET AL., NEURON, (1997), vol. 18, pages 529 - 537 | - STEPNIEWSKA ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (1993), vol. 330, pages 567 - 571 | - PREUSS ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (1996), vol. 371, pages 649 - 676 | - EVARTS, J. NEUROPHYSIOJ., (1966), vol. 29, pages 1011 - 1027 | - GEORGOPOULOS ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (1982), vol. 2, pages 1527 - 1537 | - WEINRICH; WISE, J. NEUROSCI., (1982), vol. 2, pages 1329 - 1345 | - WISE ET AL., ANNU. REV. NEUROSCI., (1997), vol. 20, pages 25 - 42 | - HALLIDAY ET AL., PROG. BIOPHYS. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 64, pages 237 - 278 | - POWELL, MATH. PROGRAM., (1977), vol. 12, pages 241 - 254 | - GHAZANFAR ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2000), vol. 20, pages 3761 - 3775 | - MITZ ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (1991), vol. 11, pages 1855 - 1872 | - HUMPHREY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1970), vol. 170, pages 758 - 762 | - GEORGOPOULOS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 1416 - 1419 | - SCHWARTZ, SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 540 - 542 | - FETZ; CHENEY, J. NEUROPHYSIOL., (1980), vol. 44, pages 751 - 772 | - STEPNIEWSKA ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (1993), vol. 330, pages 238 - 271 | - PREUSS ET AL., J. COMP. NEURAL., (1996), vol. 371, pages 649 - 676 | - BATISTA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), pages 257 - 260 | - FERAINA ET AL., J. NEUROPHYSIOL., (1997), vol. 77, pages 1034 - 1038 | - MUSSA-LVALDI, NEUROSCI LETT., (1988), vol. 91, pages 106 - 111 | - SCOTT ET AL., J. NEUROPHYSIOL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 2413 - 2426 | - SCHMIDT, ANN. BIOMED. ENG., (1980), vol. 8, pages 339 - 349 | - KENNEDY; BAKAY, NEUROREPORT, (1998), vol. 9, pages 1701 - 1711 | - NICOLELIS, NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 403 - 407 | - EVARTS, J. NEUROPHYSIOL., (1966), vol. 29, pages 1011 - 1027 | - NICOLELIS ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, pages 361 - 365 |