EP2460544 - Medical Devices with Amorphous Metals and Methods Therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusleika, Rich 9600 54th Avenue North Plymouth Minnesota MN 55442 / US | 02 /
Kravik, Rich 9600 54th Avenue North Plymouth Minnesota MN 55442 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/23] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12157951.0 | 29.06.2007 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | US20060818162P | 30.06.2006 Original published format: US 818162 P | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460544 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/02, A61L31/18, A61L29/02, A61L29/18 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A61L29/18 (EP,US);
A61L29/02 (EP,US);
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61L31/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | Medizinische Geräte mit amorphen Metallen und Verfahren dafür | [2012/23] | English: | Medical Devices with Amorphous Metals and Methods Therefor | [2012/23] | French: | Dispositifs médicaux avec des métaux amorphes et procédés correspondants | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 14.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07799223.8 / EP2035055 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070799223) is 23.03.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6669794 (BELLOUARD YVES [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-11,16 * columns 2-3 * * figures 15-25 *[I] 2,3,12-15; | [X]EP1632584 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0032] , [0035] , [0037] - [0038] * * example 2 * * claims 19-21 * | by applicant | US4653500 | US4925445 | US5067489 | US5171233 | US5288344 | US5368659 | US5549626 | US5618359 | US5711363 | US5735975 | US5803996 | US5976274 | US6107004 | WO0101118 | US6203732 | US6325868 | US2002022858 | US6391044 | US2002128680 | US2002188314 | WO02101118 | US6558415 | US2003100919 | US2003171771 | US2003176884 | US6740061 | US2004153119 | US2004153117 | US6814746 | US6843798 | US2005027212 | US7048752 | US20050680400 |