EP2521022 - Method for finely controlling contents and portable terminal supporting the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, John c/o 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Shim, Su Mi c/o 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Youn, Su Jung c/o 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Sang Ki c/o 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lim, Wan Soo c/o 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/45] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12162046.2 | 29.03.2012 | [2012/45] | Priority number, date | KR20110041379 | 02.05.2011 Original published format: KR 20110041379 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2521022 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2521022 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G06F3/0484 (KR);
G06F3/0485 (US);
G06F3/04855 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
H04N21/4314 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur feinen Steuerung von Inhalten und tragbares Endgerät damit | [2012/45] | English: | Method for finely controlling contents and portable terminal supporting the same | [2012/45] | French: | Procédé de commande fine de contenu et terminal portable prenant en charge ce procédé | [2012/45] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5513306 (MILLS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10-12 * column 8, line 43 - column 10, line 19; figure 5 * [A] 6-9,13-15 [I] 2; | [XAI]US2007198111 (OETZEL KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10-12 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0101]; figures 10,11 * [A] 6-9,13-15 [I] 2; | [XAY]EP1924089 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,10-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044]; figure -; claim - * [A] 7-9,15 [Y] 6,13,14; | [XAI]US2009282362 (MATSUMOTO KENTARO [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,10-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062]; figures 3-7 * [A] 6-9,13-15 [I] 2; | [YA]KR20110010935 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [Y] 6,13,14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019]; figure 2 *[A] 1-5,7-12,15; | [XAI] - MILLS M ET AL, "A MAGNIFIER TOOL FOR VIDEO DATA", STRIKING A BALANCE. MONTEREY, MAY 3 - 7, 1992; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS], READING, ADDISON WESLEY, US, (19920503), vol. -, pages 93 - 98, XP000426811 [X] 1,3-5,10-12 * page 94, column r, paragraph l - page 97, column l, paragraph 1; figures 2-6 * [A] 6-9,13-15 [I] 2 |