EP2471737 - escalator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ketten-Wulf Betriebs-GmbH Zum Hohenstein 15 59889 Eslohe-Kückelheim / DE | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grobbel, Burkhard Parkstraße 7 57392 Schmallenberg / DE | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Basfeld, Rainer, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Apothekerstraße 55 59755 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Brune, Axel, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Apothekerstraße 55 59755 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12162123.9 | 27.07.2007 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | DE20061036353 | 02.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036353 | DE20071034628 | 23.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007034628 | [2012/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471737 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/02 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B66B23/022 (EP,US);
B66B23/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrtreppe | [2012/27] | English: | escalator | [2012/27] | French: | escalier mécanique | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07786388.4 / EP2049428 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070786388) is 27.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4498890 (SUTHERLAND GEORGE H [US]) [X] 1,3-16 * abstract *; | [XA]GB2243430 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-16 * abstract * [A] 2,3; | [XA]DE10218374 (KONE CORP [FI]) [X] 1,4-16 * abstract *[A] 2,3; | [XA]WO2005090221 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-16 * abstract * [A] 2 | by applicant | WO03036129 | EP1344740 |