EP2669361 - Spray-dried detergent powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tantawy, Hossam Hassan The Chimes Lodge, Fulbeck Morpeth, Northumberland NE61 3JT / GB | 02 /
Martinez-Guzman, Andres Arturo 12 Marconi House, Melbourne Street Newcastle upon Tyne, Tyne and Wear NE1 2JS / GB | 03 /
Patton, Andrew Brian Greenaway Heatherlea Edmundbyers, Durham DH8 9NN / GB | 04 /
Porter, Adam 8 Kings Drive Whitley Bay, Tyne and Wear NE26 2JT / GB | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Howard, Phillip Jan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2013/49] | Howard, Phillip Jan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12170464.7 | 01.06.2012 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669361 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2669361 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D11/02, C11D17/06, C11D3/04 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
C11D11/02 (EP,US);
C11D11/0082 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | Sprühgetrocknetes Waschmittelpulver | [2013/49] | English: | Spray-dried detergent powder | [2013/49] | French: | Poudre de détergent séchée par pulvérisation | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 27.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2015
12.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | 02
08.10.2015
13.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative van Benthum, Wilhelmus A. J. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2015
12.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
02
08.10.2015
13.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative van Benthum, Wilhelmus A. J. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
Former [2016/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2015
12.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
08.10.2015
13.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative van Benthum, Wilhelmus A. J. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
Former [2015/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2015
12.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Strohe-Kamp, Geertje Henkel AG & Co. KGaA CLI Patente Henkelstraße 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
08.10.2015
13.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative van Benthum, Wilhelmus A. J. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
Former [2015/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2015
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Strohe-Kamp, Geertje Henkel AG & Co. KGaA CLI Patente Henkelstraße 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02.12.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/21] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2012 | AL | 14.01.2015 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | IE | 01.06.2015 | LU | 01.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | ES | 02.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | [2020/32] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AL | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005256023 (IMAIZUMI YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2003203832 (BOUCHER JEFFREY EDWARD [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US6908895 (BAKKER VERA JOHANNA [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 57; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6143711 (DEL GRECO ANGELA GLORIA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | BE680847 |