EP2669909 - Pressure relief device for a power transformer, and related power transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonin, Andrea Via G. Garibaldi, 23 36070 Brogliano (VI) / IT | 02 /
Carollo, Carlo Via San Benedetto, 13 36016 Thiene / IT | 03 /
Ramponi, Emanuele Via Tito Livio, 15/3 36071 Arzignano (VI) / IT | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | De Santis, Giovanni ABB S.p.A. Via L. Lama, 33 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT | [2013/49] | Application number, filing date | 12170509.9 | 01.06.2012 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669909 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/40 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
H01F27/402 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Druckentlastungsvorrichtung für einen Stromtransformator und zugehöriger Stromtransformator | [2013/49] | English: | Pressure relief device for a power transformer, and related power transformer | [2013/49] | French: | Dispositif de libération de pression pour transformateur de puissance et transformateur de puissance associé | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2010058880 (MOODY MARTIN JOHN [GB]) [I] 1,2,4,5,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; figure 2 * [A] 3,6-13; | [A]US2006260694 (BRILL RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0009]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5313974 (SAWYER ELMER E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 3, lines 28-51; figure 2 * |