EP2671630 - Mixing device having a plurality of mixing channels and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/50] | Mixing device having a plurality of mixing channels | ||
[2016/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manickam, Bhuvaneswaran GE Power & Water, Jenbacher Gas Engines Austria Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | 02 /
Bienholz, Arne Martin GE Power & Water, Jenbacher Gas Engines Austria Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | 03 /
Hillen, Friedhelm GE Power & Water, Jenbacher Gas Engines Austria Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | [2016/32] |
Former [2013/50] | 01 /
Manickam, Bhuvaneswaran GE Power & Water, Jenbacher Gas Engines Austria Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | ||
02 /
Bienholz, Arne Martin GE Power & Water, Jenbacher Gas Engines Austria Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | |||
03 /
Hillen, Friedhelm GE Power & Water, Jenbacher Gas Engines Austria Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2016/32] |
Former [2013/50] | Picker, Madeline Margaret GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12171197.2 | 07.06.2012 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2671630 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2671630 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04, B01F5/00, B01F5/06, F01N3/20 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
B01F25/103 (EP,US);
B01F25/10 (US);
B01F25/31322 (EP,US);
B01F25/31332 (EP,US);
B01F25/4523 (EP,US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N3/2033 (EP,US);
F01N3/24 (US);
F01N3/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2013/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mischvorrichtung mit mehreren Mischkanälen und Verwendung davon | [2016/17] | English: | Mixing device having a plurality of mixing channels and use thereof | [2016/17] | French: | Appareil mélangeur ayant une pluralité de canaux de mélange et son utilisation | [2016/17] |
Former [2013/50] | Mischvorrichtung mit mehreren Mischkanälen | ||
Former [2013/50] | Mixing device having a plurality of mixing channels | ||
Former [2013/50] | Dispositif d'actionnement électrique au guidon pour changement de vitesses de bicyclette | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 12.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/51] | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 05.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees FI, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 05.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2012 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.06.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.06.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 07.06.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 07.06.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.06.2012 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | LT | 10.08.2016 | |
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3702619 (SON JAIME S) [X] 1,2,9-11 * column 2, line 23 - line 45 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 22 * * figure 2 * [A] 3-8,12,13; | [XA]EP1004767 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 7,8,10,12,13 * [A] 6-8,11-13; | [XA]DE102006055655 (IGS DEV GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 3,4,6,7,13; | [XA]US2009165756 (SHIEH TENGHUA TOM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1C,1D * [A] 4,6-8,11-13; | [XA]US2009293721 (MILLER SCOTT D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 3-7 *[A] 3-8,11-13 |