EP2562400 - Method for regenerating a particulate filter of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEUGEOT CITROËN AUTOMOBILES SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states PEUGEOT CITROËN AUTOMOBILES SA Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camescasse, Cyril 7 Rue de Paris 95150 Taverny / FR | [2013/09] | Application number, filing date | 12171555.1 | 11.06.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | FR20110057466 | 23.08.2011 Original published format: FR 1157466 | [2013/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562400 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02D41/00, F02D13/02 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
F02D41/029 (EP);
F02D13/0261 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP);
F02D2041/001 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regeneration eines Partikelfilters einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2013/09] | English: | Method for regenerating a particulate filter of an internal combustion engine | [2013/09] | French: | Procédé de régénération d'un filtre à particules de moteur à combustion interne | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011072794 (VAN NIEUWSTADT MICHIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0015] , [0076] - [0078]; figures 1,5 * * paragraphs [0081] - [0082] - [0085] , [0087] - [0091] * [I] 7; | [A]US2011120090 (SORENSEN JR CHARLES MITCHEL [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US7275516 (CUNNINGHAM RALPH WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009012336 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017] , [0028] , [0029]; figures 1,2,4 * |