EP2534933 - Seeder with support elements constituting the transport wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seemann, Michel 5, Rue du Château 57370 Danne et Quatre Vents / FR | 02 /
Potier, Philippe 18, Route de Siewiller 57370 Veckersviller / FR | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Hager, Esther Evelyne Kuhn SAS 4 Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Esch, Esther Evelyne Kuhn S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | Application number, filing date | 12172008.0 | 14.06.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | FR20110055318 | 17.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1155318 | [2012/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534933 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01B49/02, A01B49/06, A01B73/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A01B49/06 (EP);
A01B49/027 (EP);
A01B73/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sämaschine mit Verdichtungselementen, die die Transporträder bilden | [2012/51] | English: | Seeder with support elements constituting the transport wheels | [2012/51] | French: | Semoir avec des éléments de rappui constituant les roues de transport | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10359775 (LEMKEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraph 22 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 2,3,6,9; | [A]DE102004012791 (LEMKEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 17 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE10307396 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 3, paragraphs 22,25,27 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1336330 (KUHN HUARD SA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 13,15,16 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9010178U (MACHINENFABRIK RAU) [A] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE20122586U (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, paragraphs 12,14 * * page 3, paragraph 14 * * figure -; claim - * |