EP2546950 - Electrical charging system having energy coupling arrangement for wireless energy transmission therebetween. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyer, Richard J. 5269 Streeter road Mantua, OH Ohio 44255 / US | 02 /
Pasha, Brian D. 505 Sycamore Trail Cortland, OH Ohio 44410 / US | 03 /
Fuzo, John Victor 158 Diamond Way Cortland, OH Ohio 44410 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Robert, Vincent, et al Aptiv Services France SAS Aptiv EMEA Patent Department Bâtiment Le Raspail - Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations, CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/03] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12173342.2 | 25.06.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | US201161506242P | 11.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161506242 P | US201213450881 | 19.04.2012 Original published format: US201213450881 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546950 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2546950 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02, B60L11/18 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
B60L53/122 (EP,US);
B60L53/38 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/12 (KR);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L53/665 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/12 (US);
H02J50/80 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/00036 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00047 (EP,US);
B60L2240/62 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/35 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2200/92 (KR);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
Y02T90/167 (EP,US);
Y04S30/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrisches Ladesystem mit einer Energiekupplungsanordnung für drahtlose Energieübertragung dazwischen | [2013/03] | English: | Electrical charging system having energy coupling arrangement for wireless energy transmission therebetween. | [2013/03] | French: | Système de charge électrique ayant un agencement de couplage d'énergie pour transmission d'énergie sans fil entre eux | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPH0917666 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [I] 1 * abstract *[Y] 2; | [XYI]WO2010131346 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 37]; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2 [I] 3-5,8; | [E]US9186995 (ICHIKAWA SHINJI [JP]) [E] 1 * column 5, lines 1-26; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | HK120933 | US2006269374 | WO2007008646 | EP1902505 | KR20080031398 | JP2008521453 | CN101258658 | AU2007349874 | WO2008118178 | US2008278264 | US2009195333 | US2009195332 | US2009224856 | US2009267710 | US2009267709 | US2009284083 | WO2009140506 | EP2130287 | JP2010500897 | AU2010200044 | KR20100015954 | CN101682216 | WO2010036980 | WO2010039967 | US2010096934 | US2010102641 | US2010102640 | US2010102639 | US2010109445 | US2010117456 | US2010117455 | US2010123355 | US2010123354 | US2010123353 | US2010127575 | US2010127574 | US2010127573 | US2010133920 | US2010133919 | US2010133918 | US2010141042 | US2010148589 | US7741734 | US2010164298 | US2010164297 | US2010164296 | US2010171368 | US2010181845 | US2010181843 | US2010187911 | US7800344 | US7825543 | US2012126747 | HK20030101055 |