|
17.12.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
29.10.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
29.10.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
28.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.07.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.12.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.11.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
46 |
|
26.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
21.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.10.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |