EP2586788 - Prevention of disulfide bond reduction during recombinant production of polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kao, Yung-hsiang 760 Pico Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 02 /
Schmidt, Melody Trexher 30 Northview Court Danville, CA 94506 / US | 03 /
Laird, Michael W. 244 Silk Hill Ct. San Ramon, CA 94582 / US | 04 /
Wong, Rita L. 15 West Summit Drive Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | 05 /
Hewitt, Daniel P. 715 Conrado Terrace, Unit 1 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Woolley, Lindsey Claire, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2013/18] | Woolley, Lindsey Claire, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12178200.7 | 08.07.2008 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US20070948677P | 09.07.2007 Original published format: US 948677 P | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586788 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586788 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, C07K14/00 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/38 (KR);
C07K14/00 (CN);
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07K1/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07K1/22 (KR);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/2863 (KR);
C07K16/32 (KR);
C12N5/0018 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2013/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verhindern der Disulfid-Bindungsreduktion während der rekombinanten Herstellung von Polypeptiden | [2013/18] | English: | Prevention of disulfide bond reduction during recombinant production of polypeptides | [2013/18] | French: | Prévention de la réduction des liaisons de disulfure pendant la production recombinante de polypeptides | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 20.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08781481.0 / EP2188302 | Divisional application(s) | EP17196350.7 / EP3327026 | EP19181777.4 / EP3597659 | EP23153140.1 / EP4219522 | EP23172637.3 / EP4245766 | EP23214759.5 / EP4335863 | EP24160370.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080781481) is 19.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2018
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | 03
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | 04
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE UCB Biopharma SRL Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Biopharma SRL Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | 05
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 06
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | 07
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 08
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Oetke, Cornelia Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | 09
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2018
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
04
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE UCB Biopharma SRL Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Biopharma SRL Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
05
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
06
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
08
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Oetke, Cornelia Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
09
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2021/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2018
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
04
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE UCB Biopharma SRL Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Biopharma SRL Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
05
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
06
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
08
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Oetke, Cornelia Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
09
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Oates, Edward Christopher Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2020/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2018
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
04
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE UCB Biopharma SRL Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Biopharma SRL Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
05
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
06
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
08
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Oetke, Cornelia Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
09
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Oates, Edward Christopher Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2018/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2018
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 DE-40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
04
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE UCB Biopharma SPRL IP Department 60, Allée de la Recherche 1070 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Biopharma SPRL Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
05
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
06
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
08
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Oetke, Cornelia Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
09
29.08.2018
03.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Oates, Edward Christopher Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2018/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2018
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 DE-40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
27.08.2018
30.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Bhogal, Jasber Kaur GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
04
29.08.2018
UCB Biopharma SPRL IP Department 60, Allée de la Recherche 1070 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative UCB Intellectual Property c/o UCB Biopharma SPRL Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
05
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
06
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07
29.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 11.09.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2020 | 15.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2022 | 31.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.09.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/03] | 14.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9726357 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2007292411 (SALCEDO THEODORA W [US], et al) [AP] 1-20 * paragraph [[0905] [0906]] *; | [AD] - CHADERJIAN WENDY B ET AL, "Effect of copper sulfate on performance of a serum-free CHO cell culture process and the level of free thiol in the recombinant antibody expressed", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (200503), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 550 - 553, XP002500111 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP0497029 | [A] - KERBLAT I ET AL, "Importance of thioredoxin in the proteolysis of an immunoglobulin G as antigen by lysosomal Cys-proteases", IMMUNOLOGY, (199905), vol. 97, no. 1, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 62 - 68, XP002519384 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2567.1999.00748.x | [A] - BOBOVNIKOVA Y ET AL, "Characterization of soluble, disulfide bond-stabilized, prokaryotically depressed human thyrotropin receptor ectodomain", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1997), vol. 138, no. 2, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 588 - 593, XP002519385 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 588, column R, paragraphs 1-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.138.2.588 | [A] - TEILUM K ET AL, "Disulfide Bond Formation and Folding of Plant Peroxidases Expressed as Inclusion Body Protein inEscherichia coliThioredoxin Reductase Negative Strains", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (19990201), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 77 - 82, XP004441744 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 77, right-hand column, last sentence of last full paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1998.0985 | [A] - POWIS G ET AL, "Thioredoxin redox control of cell growth and death and the effects of inhibitors", CHEMICO-BIOLOGICAL INTERACTIONS 19980424 IE, (19980424), vol. 111-112, ISSN 0009-2797, pages 23 - 34, XP002519386 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2797(97)00148-8 | [A] - POWIS G ET AL, "Properties and biological activities of thioredoxins", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY 2001 US, (2001), vol. 41, ISSN 0362-1642, pages 261 - 295, XP002519387 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.pharmtox.41.1.261 | [A] - NORDBERG J ET AL, "Reactive oxygen species, antioxidants, and the mammalian thioredoxin system.", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE 1 DEC 2001, (20011201), vol. 31, no. 11, ISSN 0891-5849, pages 1287 - 1312, XP002519388 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0891-5849(01)00724-9 | [A] - URIG S ET AL, "On the potential of thioredoxin reductase inhibitors for cancer therapy", SEMINARS IN CANCER BIOLOGY, SAUNDERS SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, vol. 16, no. 6, ISSN 1044-579X, (20061201), pages 452 - 465, (20061201), XP024908082 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.semcancer.2006.09.004 | [A] - ZHANG WEI ET AL, "Free sulfhydryl in recombinant monoclonal antibodies", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (200205), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 [A] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | [A] - SMITH M A ET AL, "SPECIFIC CLEAVAGE OF IMMUNOGLOBULIN G BY COPPER IONS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (19960701), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0367-8377, pages 48 - 55, XP000594105 [A] 1-20 | [A] - LI LAN ET AL, "Low level formation of potent catalytic IgG fragments mediated by disulfide bond instability", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 33, no. 7-8, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 593 - 600, XP002519389 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(96)00021-1 | [A] - SALAS-SOLANO OSCAR ET AL, "Optimization and validation of a quantitative capillary electrophoresis sodium dodecyl sulfate method for quality control and stability monitoring of monoclonal antibodies.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY 15 SEP 2006, (20060915), vol. 78, no. 18, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 6583 - 6594, XP002519390 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AC060828P | [T] - TREXLER-SCHMIDT M ET AL, "Identification and prevention of antibody disulfide bond reduction during cell culture manufacturing", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 20100615 JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. USA, (20100615), vol. 106, no. 3, doi:10.1002/BIT.22699, pages 452 - 461, XP002694206 [T] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22699 | [T] - KAO YUNG-HSIANG ET AL, "Mechanism of Antibody Reduction in Cell Culture Production Processes", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (201011), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 622 - 632, XP002694207 [T] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.22848 | [T] - MUN MELISSA S ET AL, "BIOT 245-Air sparging of harvested cell culture fluid (HCCF) to prevent antibody disulfide bond reduction", ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, & 238TH AMERICAN-CHEMICAL-SOCIETY NATIONAL MEETING; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; AUGUST 16 -20, 2009, (200908), vol. 238, ISSN 0065-7727, pages 245 - BIOT, XP009168192 [T] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - STARKS COURTNEY M ET AL, "Atomic-resolution crystal structure of thioredoxin from the acidophilic bacterium Acetobacter aceti", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (200701), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 92 - 98, XP002694208 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.062519707 | [A] - GROMER STEPHAN ET AL, "The thioredoxin system: From science to clinic.", MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (200401), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0198-6325, pages 40 - 89, XP002694209 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/med.10051 | by applicant | EP0003089 | USRE30985E | EP0139383 | US4515893 | US4560655 | EP0183070 | WO8700195 | US4657866 | US4676980 | EP0244234 | US4767704 | EP0307247 | US4816567 | US4861579 | EP0330191 | EP0332865 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | US4943529 | EP0394538 | EP0402226 | EP0404097 | WO9100360 | WO9110741 | US5091313 | US5091178 | US5122469 | WO9220373 | WO9301161 | WO9304173 | WO9308829 | WO9316185 | WO9400136 | EP0420937 | WO9503770 | WO9519181 | WO9523865 | WO9600948 | US5500362 | US5545807 | US5545806 | WO9627011 | WO9630046 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9640210 | US5595721 | US5622700 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5639635 | WO9726912 | US5661016 | US5672347 | US5677180 | US5693762 | US5714338 | WO9806248 | US5721121 | US5721108 | US5725856 | US5736137 | WO9823761 | WO9824893 | US5776456 | US5783186 | US5807715 | US5821337 | WO9845331 | WO9851793 | US5843439 | US5843398 | US5849898 | WO9856418 | US5854067 | WO9858964 | WO9922764 | WO9951642 | US6015542 | WO0009160 | US6037454 | WO0020864 | WO0027428 | WO0027433 | US6090365 | WO0042072 | WO0044788 | US6120767 | WO0067796 | WO0067795 | WO0075348 | WO0074718 | WO0076542 | US6171586 | WO0103734 | WO0110462 | WO0110461 | WO0110460 | US6194551 | WO0113945 | US6224866 | US6242195 | WO0140309 | US6287537 | WO0172333 | WO0174388 | WO0177342 | WO0180884 | WO0197858 | US2002004587 | US2002006404 | WO0204021 | US2002009444 | US2002012665 | US6368596 | US2002041847 | WO0234790 | US2002058029 | US6399061 | US6410391 | WO02060955 | US2002128488 | US6455043 | WO02079255 | US2002197255 | US2002197256 | WO02102312 | WO03002607 | US2003021781 | US2003026801 | US6528624 | US6538124 | US2003068664 | US2003082172 | US2003095963 | US2003103971 | WO03049694 | WO03056012 | US2003133930 | WO03061694 | US6602684 | WO03064621 | US2003147885 | US2003157108 | WO03068821 | US2003175884 | US2003185796 | US2003219818 | US2003219433 | US2004093621 | US2004110704 | US2004132140 | WO2006083971 | US7169908 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - SIDHU ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 338, no. 2, pages 299 - 310 | - LEE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 340, no. 5, pages 1073 - 1093 | - FELLOUSE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, no. 34, pages 12467 - 12472 | - LEE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 284, no. 1-2, pages 119 - 132 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859 | - MORRISON, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 812 - 813 | - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 851 | - NEUBERGER, NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, page 826 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - JONES, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - VASWANI; HAMILTON, ANN. ALLERGY, ASTHMA & IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 1, pages 105 - 115 | - HARRIS, BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANSACTIONS, (1995), vol. 23, pages 1035 - 1038 | - HURLE; GROSS, CURR. OP. BIOTECH., (1994), vol. 5, pages 428 - 433 | - MARKS, BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS ET AL., PROC NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813 | - SCHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - YELTON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004 | - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HUDSON ET AL., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 129 - 134 | - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - SHI Y., TRENDS IN GENETICS, (2003), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 9 - 12 | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC. | - D. WEIR & C. BLACKWELL,, Handbook of Experimental Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, BOSTON. | - BABSON, A.L.; BABSON, S.R., "Kinetic Colorimetric Measurement of Serum Lactate Dehydrogenase Activity", CLIN. CHEM., (1973), vol. 19, pages 766 - 769, XP009119838 | - LAIRD ET AL., "Optimization of BLyS Production and Purification from Eschericia coli", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2005), vol. 39, pages 237 - 246 | - JOHN C. JOLY ET AL., "Overexpression of Eschericia coli Oxidoreductases Increases Recombinant Insulin-like Growth Factor-1 Accumulation", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199803), vol. 95, pages 2773 - 2777 | - DANA C. ANDERSEN ET AL., "Production Technologies for Monoclonal Antibodies and Their Fragments", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.copbio.2004.08.002, pages 456 - 462, XP004588033 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2004.08.002 | - YARIV MAZOR ET AL., "Isolation of Engineered, Full-length Antibodies from Libraries Expressed in Escherichia coli", NATURE BIOTECH., (20070601), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1296, pages 563 - 565, XP002488027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1296 | - LAURA C. SIMMONS ET AL., "Expression of Full-length Immunoglobulins in Escherichia coli: Rapid and Efficient Production of Aglycosylated Antibodies", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2002), vol. 263, pages 133 - 147 | - PAUL H. BESSETTE ET AL., "Efficient Folding of Proteins with Multiple Disulfide Bonds in the Escherichia coli cytoplasm", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.96.24.13703, pages 13703 - 08, XP002233564 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.24.13703 | - CHADERJIAN, W.B.; CHIN, E.T.; HARRIS, R.J.; ETCHEVERRY, T.M., "Effect of copper sulfate on performance of a serum-free CHO cell culture process and the level of free thiol in the recombinant antibody expressed", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2005), vol. 21, pages 550 - 553 | - GORDON G.; MACKOW M.C.; LEVY H.R., "On the mechanism of interaction of steroids with human glucose 6-phosphate dehydrogenase", ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1995), vol. 318, pages 25 - 29 | - GROMCR S.; URIG S.; BECKER K., "TheTrx System - From Science to Clinic", MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 24, pages 40 - 89 | - HAMMES G.G.; KOCHAVI D., "Studies of the Enzyme Hexokinase. I. Steady State Kinetics at pH 8", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1962), vol. 84, pages 2069 - 2073 | - HAMMES G.G.; KOCHAVI D., "Studies of the Enzyme Hexokinase. III. The Role of the Metal Ion", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1962), vol. 84, pages 2076 - 2079 | - JOHANSSON C.; LILLIG C.H.; HOLMGREN A., "Human Mitochondrial Glutaredoxin Reduces S-Glutathionylated Proteins with High Affinity Accepting Electrons from Either Glutathione or Thioredoxin Rcductase", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 7537 - 7543 | - LEGRAND, C.; BOUR, J.M.; JACOB, C.; CAPIAUMONT J.; MARTIAL, A.; MARC, A.; WUDTKE, M.; KRETZMER, G.; DEMANGEL, C.; DUVAL, D., "Lactate Dehydrogenase (LDH) Activity of the Number of Dead Cells in the Medium of Cultured Eukaryotic Cells as Marker", J. BIOTECHNOL., (1992), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-1656(92)90158-6, pages 231 - 243, XP024346496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(92)90158-6 | - "Yeast Hexokinase : ATP + Hexose --> Hexose-6-phosphate + ADP", MCDONALD, M.R., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1955), vol. 1, pages 269 - 276 | - SOLS, A.; DELAFUENTE, G.; VILLAR-PALASI, C.; ASENSIO, C., "Substrate Specificity and Some Other Properties of Bakers' Yeast Hexokinase", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1958), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-3002(58)90245-2, pages 92 - 101, XP023378283 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-3002(58)90245-2 | - KIRKPATRICK D.L.; KUPERUS M.; DOWDESWELL M.; POTIER N.; DONALD L.J.; KUNKEL M.; BERGGREN M.; ANGULO M.; POWIS G., "Mechanisms of inhibition of the Trx growth factor system by antitumor 2-imidazolyl disulfides", BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1998), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1016/S0006-2952(97)00597-2, pages 987 - 994, XP002979943 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-2952(97)00597-2 | - KIRKPATRICK D.L.; WATSON S.; KUNKEL M.; FLETCHER S.; ULHAQ S.; POWIS G., "Parallel syntheses of disulfide inhibitors of the Trx redox system as potential antitumor agents", ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1999), vol. 14, pages 421 - 432 | - MILHAUSEN, M.; LEVY, H.R., "Evidence for an Essential Lysine in G6PD from Leuconostoc mesenteroides", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1975), vol. 50, pages 453 - 461 | - PLEASANTS, J.C.; GUO, W.; RABENSTEIN, D.L., "A comparative study of the kinetics of selenol/diselenide and thiol/disulfide exchange reactions", J. AM. CHEM. SOC. ILL, (1989), pages 6553 - 6558 | - WHITESIDES, G.M.; LILBUM, J.E.; SZAJEWSKI, R.P., "Rates of thioldisulfide interchange reactions between mono- and dithiols and Ellman's reagent", J. ORG. CHEM., (1977), vol. 42, pages 332 - 338 | - WIPF P.; HOPKINS T.D.; LUNG J.K.; RODRIGUEZ S.; BIRMINGHAM A.; SOUTHWICK E.C.; LAZO J.S.; POWIS G, "New inhibitors of the Trx-TrxR system based on a naphthoquinone spiroketal natural product lead", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2001), vol. 11, pages 2637 - 2641 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - HAM; WALLACE, METH. IN ENZ., (1979), vol. 58, page 44 | - BARNES; SATO, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 102, page 255 | - CHADERJIAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2005), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 550 - 3 | - FAHRNER ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. GENET. ENG. REV., (2001), vol. 18, pages 301 - 27 | - BEACH; NURSE, NATURE, (1981), vol. 290, page 140 | - FLEER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 2, pages 968 - 975 | - LOUVENCOURT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), page 737 | - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 135 | - SREEKRISHNA ET AL., J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 28, pages 265 - 278 | - CASE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 5259 - 5263 | - TILBURN ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 26, pages 205 - 221 | - YELTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - KELLY; HYNES, EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 475 - 479 | - C. ANTHONY, THE BIOCHEMISTRY OF METHYLOTROPHS, (1982), page 269 | - BACHMANN, Cellular and Molecular Biology, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 2, pages 1190 - 1219 | - BASS ET AL., PROTEINS, (1990), vol. 8, pages 309 - 314 | - KIPRIYANOV; LITTLE, MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 12, pages 173 - 201 | - SKERRA; PLUCKTHUN, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - ENGLER, Protein Purification Process Engineering, (1994), pages 37 - 550 | - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 4285 - 4289 | - ST JOHN ET AL., CHEST, (1993), vol. 103, page 932 | - KIM ET AL., GROWTH FACTORS, (1992), vol. 7, pages 53 - 64 | - STEPPE ET AL., TRANSPLANT INTL., (1991), vol. 4, pages 3 - 7 | - HOURMANT ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1994), vol. 58, pages 377 - 380 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 2623 - 2632 | - LORENZ ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 156, no. 4, pages 1646 - 1653 | - DHAINAUT ET AL., CRIT. CARE MED., (1995), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1461 - 1469 | - CHOY ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 52 - 56 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 337 | - GRAZIANO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, no. 10, pages 4996 - 5002 | - SHARKEY ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5935S - 5945S | - CERIANI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5852S - 5856S | - RICHMAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5916S - 5920S | - LITTON ET AL., EUR J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 1 - 9 | - ELLIS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, no. 2, pages 925 - 937 | - JURCIC ET AL., CANCER RES, (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5908S - 5910S | - JUWEID ET AL., CANCER RES, (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5899S - 5907S | - REFF ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 435 - 445 | - MALONEY ET AL., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 88, no. 10, page 637A | - DEMIDEM ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHERAPY & RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (1997), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 177 - 186 | - PEROTTA; ABUEL, "Response of chronic relapsing ITP of 10 years duration to Rituximab", BLOOD, (1998), vol. 10, no. 1, page 88B | - STASHI ET AL., "Rituximab chimeric anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody treatment for adults with chronic idopathic thrombocytopenic purpura", BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, no. 4, pages 952 - 957 | - LEANDRO ET AL., "Clinical outcome in 22 patients with rheumatoid arthritis treated with B lymphocyte depletion", ANN RHEUM DIS, (2002), vol. 61, pages 833 - 888 | - LEANDRO ET AL., "Lymphocyte depletion in rheumatoid arthritis: early evidence for safety, efficacy and dose response", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2001), vol. 44, no. 9, page S370 | - LEANDRO ET AL., "An open study ofB lymphocyte depletion in systemic lupus erythematosus", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2002), vol. 46, no. I, pages 2673 - 2677 | - EDWARDS; CAMBRIDGE, "Sustained improvement in rheumatoid arthritis following a protocol designed to deplete B lymphocytes", RHEUMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1093/rheumatology/40.2.205, pages 205 - 211, XP002348931 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/40.2.205 | - EDWARDS ET AL., "B-lymphocyte depletion therapy in rheumatoid arthritis and other autoimmune disorders", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2002), vol. 30, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1042/BST0300824, pages 824 - 828, XP002306250 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST0300824 | - EDWARDS ET AL., "Efficacy and safety of Rituximab, a B-cell targeted chimeric monoclonal antibody: A randomized, placebo controlled trial in patients with rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2002), vol. 46, no. 9, page S197 | - LEVINE; PESTRONK, "IgM antibody-related polyneuropathies: B-cell depletion chemotherapy using Rituximab", NEUROLOGY, (1999), vol. 52, pages 1701 - 1704, XP000942610 | - DEVITA ET AL., "Efficacy of selective B cell blockade in the treatment of rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2002), vol. 46, pages 2029 - 2033 | - SARWAL ET AL., N. ENG. J. MED., (20030710), vol. 349, no. 2, pages 125 - 138 | - LEHRNBECHER ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 94, page 4220 | - SHINKAWA ET AL., J BIO. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 3466 - 347 | - NIWA R. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, no. 6, pages 2127 - 2133 | - BASELGA ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 737 - 744 | - TAGLIABUE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1991), vol. 47, pages 933 - 937 | - MCKENZIE ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1989), vol. 4, pages 543 - 548 | - MAIER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 5361 - 5369 | - BACUS ET AL., MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS, (1990), vol. 3, pages 350 - 362 | - STANCOVSKI ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1991), vol. 88, pages 8691 - 8695 | - BACUS ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, pages 2580 - 2589 | - XU ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1993), vol. 53, pages 401 - 408 | - KASPRZYK ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, pages 2771 - 2776 | - HANCOCK ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 4575 - 4580 | - SHAWVER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 1367 - 1373 | - ARTEAGA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 3758 - 3765 | - HARWERTH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 15160 - 15167 | - KLAPPER ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, pages 2099 - 2109 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 1 03 | - KOZBOR, J. LMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR, Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6851 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - MARKS ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 3, no. 21, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2623 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - BRUGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - DUCHOSAL ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, page 258 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (1996), vol. 14, page 309 | - MORIMOTO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - MILLSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - SHALABY ET AL., EXP. MED., (1992), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., LMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - GRUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 5368 | - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062 | - TUTT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, page 60 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 1027 - 1037 | - ARUFFO, CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 1303 - 1313 | - STAMENKOVIC ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 1133 - 1144 | WO1998US13410 | Opposition | WO9403603 | US2003040095 | WO9954440 | US2005038231 | WO2008127305 | WO2009009523 | US2004138428 | WO2005016968 | WO2006047340 | US2004138424 | US2006142549 | WO2008083288 | WO9726357 | WO03102132 | US7153426 | US2007292411 | US2003152966 | WO2008121616 | EP0185459 | EP0414151 | WO0204616 | US2006040348 | US2006216790 | EP2586788 | - FOLLMAN et al., "Factorial screening of antibody purification processes using three chromatography steps without protein A", Journal of Chromatography A ., (20040123), vol. 1024, pages 79 - 85, XP002574059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2003.10.060 | - LYDERSEN, "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, (19940000), vol. 75, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - NECINA, "Capture of human monoclonal antibodies from cell culture supernatant by ion exchange media exhibiting high charge density", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (19981220), vol. 60, no. 6, pages 689 - 698, XP002616454 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19981220)60:6<689::AID-BIT6>3.0.CO;2-M | - ROUSH, "Advances in Primary Recovery: Centrifugation and Membrane Technology", Biotechnological Progress, (20080415), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 488 - 495, XP055090116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp070414x | - MAGNUSSON, "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", Molecular Immunology, (19970000), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 709 - 717, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - XIA, "The Mammalian Cytosolic Selenoenzyme Thioredoxin Reductase Reduces Ubiquinone", The Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20030000), vol. 278, no. 4, pages 2141 - 2146, XP055518085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210456200 | - TREXLER-SCHMIDT, "Identification and prevention of antibody disulfide bond reduction during cell culture manufacturing", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20100000), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 452 - 461, XP002694206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22699 | - KAO, "Mechanism of Antibody Reduction in Cell Culture Production Processes", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20100000), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 622 - 632, XP002694207 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.22848 | - KERBLAT et al., "Importance of thioredoxin in the proteolysis of an immunoglobulin G as antigen by lysosomal Cys-proteases", Immunology, (19990500), vol. 97, no. 1, pages 62 - 68, XP002519384 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2567.1999.00748.x | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19941130), vol. 745, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - MAGNUSSON et al., "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", Molecular Immunology, (19970000), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 709 - 717, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - XIA et al., "The Mammalian Cytosolic Selenoenzyme Thioredoxin Reductase Reduces Ubiquinone", J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 2141 - 2146, XP055518085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210456200 | - "Reduction of disulfides by thioredoxin. Exceptional reactivity of insulin and suggested functions of thioredoxin in mechanism of hormone action", Holmgren, J. Biol. Chem., (19790000), vol. 254, no. 18, pages 9113 - 9119, XP055515419 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9258(19)86818-7 | - CHADERJIAN et al., "Effect of copper sulfate on performance of a serum-free CHO cell culture process and the level of free thiol in the recombinant antibody expressed", Biotechnol. Prog., (20050000), vol. 21, pages 550 - 553, XP002500111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP0497029 | - ZHANG et al., "Free sulfhydryl in recombinant monoclonal antibodies", Biotechnol . Prog., (20020000), vol. 18, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | - LEVY et al., "Production of Correctly Folded Fab Antibody Fragment in the Cytoplasm of Escherichia coli trxB gor Mutants via the Coexpression of Molecular Chaperones", Protein Expression and Purification, (20010000), vol. 23, pages 338 - 347, XP055024235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.2001.1520 | - TREXLER-SCHMIDT et al., "Identification and prevention of antibody disulfide bond reduction during cell culture manufacturing", Biotechnology & Bioengineering, (20100000), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 452 - 461, XP002694206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22699 | - GLYNN, "Process-Scale Precipitation of Impurities in Mammalian Cell Culture Broth", BioParm International, (20080302), vol. 2008, no. 3, XP055518505 | - MAGNUSSEN et al., "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", Mol Immunology, (19970000), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 709 - 719, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - KERBLAT et al., "Importance of thioredoxin in the proteolysis of an immunoglobulin G as antigen by lysosomal Cys-proteases", Immunology, (19990000), vol. 97, pages 62 - 68, XP002519384 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2567.1999.00748.x | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Ann NY Acad of Sci., (19940000), vol. 745, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - ZHONG et al., "Essential Role of Selenium in the Catalytic Activities of Mammalian Thioredoxin Reductase Revealed by Characterization of Recombinant Enzymes with Selenocysteine Mutations", JBC, (20000000), vol. 275, no. 24, pages 18121 - 18128, XP055518546 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M000690200 | - Z HANG et al., "Free sulfhydryl in recombinant monoclonal antibodies", Biotechnol. Prog., (20020000), vol. 18, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences,, (19941130), vol. 745, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - ROUSH et al., "Advances in Primary Recovery: Centrifugation and Membrane Technology", Biotechnology Progress,, (20080000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 488 - 495, XP055090116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp070414x | - NEERGARD et al., "Stability of Monoclonal Antibodies at High-Concentration: Head-to-Head Comparison of the IgG 1 and IgG 4 Subclass", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20130000), vol. 103, no. 1, pages 115 - 127, XP055160507 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.23788 | - WANG et al., "Effect of Ionic Strength and pH on the Physical and Chemical Stability of a Monoclonal Antibody Antigen-Binding Fragment", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (20130000), vol. 102, no. 8, pages 2520 - 2537, XP055518558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.23645 | - VERMEER et al., "The Thermal Stability of Immunoglobulin: Unfolding and Aggregation of a Multi-Domain Protein", Biophysical Journal,, (20000000), vol. 78, pages 394 - 404, XP055518561 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-3495(00)76602-1 | - MAGNUSSON et al., "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (19970000), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 709 - 717, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - ZHANG et al., "Free sulfhydryl in recombinant monoclonal antibodies", Biotechnology Progress, (20020000), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | - SINGH, "Thiol-disulfide interchange", THE CHEMISTRY OF SULPHUR-CONTAINING FUNCTIONAL GROUPS, (19930000), pages 633 - 658, XP003033408 | - TREXLER SCHMIDT et al., "Identification and prevention of antibody disulfide bond reduction during cell culture manufacturing", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20090000), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 452 - 461, XP002694206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22699 | - CHADERJIAN et al., "Effect of copper sulfate on performance of a serum-free CHO cell culture process and the level of free thiol in the recombinant antibody expressed", Biotechnol. Prog., (20050000), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 550 - 553, XP002500111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP0497029 | - BOBOVNIKOVA et al., "Characterization of soluble, disulfide bond-stabilized, prokaryotically depressed human thyrotropin receptor ectodomain", Endocrinology, (19970000), vol. 138, no. 2, pages 588 - 593, XP002519385 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.138.2.588 | - TEILUM et al., "Disulfide Bond Formation and Folding of Plant Peroxidases Expressed as Inclusion Body Protein in Escherichia coli Thioredoxin Reductase Negative Strains", Protein Expres. Purif., (19990000), vol. 15, pages 77 - 82, XP004441744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1998.0985 | - POWIS et al., "Thioredoxin redox control of cell growth and death and the effects of inhibitors", Chem-Biol Interact., (19980000), vol. 111-112, pages 23 - 34, XP002519386 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2797(97)00148-8 | - POWIS et al., "Properties and biological activities of thioredoxins", Annu. Rev. Pharmacol. Toxicol., (20010000), vol. 41, pages 261 - 295, XP002519387 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.pharmtox.41.1.261 | - NORDBERG et al., "Reactive oxygen species, antioxidants, and the mammalian thioredoxin system", Free Radical Bio. Med., (20010000), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1287 - 1312, XP002519388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0891-5849(01)00724-9 | - URIG et al., "On the potential of thioredoxin reductase inhibitors for cancer therapy", Semin. Cancer Biol., (20060000), vol. 16, pages 452 - 465, XP005727270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.semcancer.2006.09.004 | - ZHANG et al., "Free sulfhydryl in recombinant monoclonal antibodies", Biotechnol. Prog., (20020000), vol. 18, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | - TREXLER-SCHMIDT et al., "Identification and prevention of antibody disulfide bond reduction during cell culture manufacturing", Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20100000), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 452 - 461, XP002694206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22699 | - KAO et al., "Mechanism of Antibody Reduction in Cell Culture Production Processes", Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20100000), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 622 - 632, XP002694207 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.22848 | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19940000), vol. 745, no. 1, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - ROUSH et al., "Advances in Primary Recovery: Centrifugation and Membrane Technology", Biotechnol. Prog., (20080000), vol. 24, pages 488 - 495, XP055090116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp070414x | - SMITH et al., "Specific cleavage of immunoglobulin G by copper ions.", Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19960000), vol. 48, pages 48 - 55, XP000594105 | - LI et al., "Low level formation of potent catalytic IgG fragments mediated by disulfide bond instability", Mol. Immunol., (19960000), vol. 33, no. 7-8, pages 593 - 600, XP002519389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(96)00021-1 | - SALAS-SOLANO et al., "Optimization and validation of a quantitative capillary electrophores is sodium dodecyl sulfate method for quality control and stability monitoring of monoclonal antibodies.", Anal. Chem., (20060000), vol. 78, no. 18, XP055518605 | - MUN et al., "Air sparging of harvested cell culture fluid (HCCF) to prevent antibody disulfide bond reduction BIOT 245", Abstracts of Papers American Chemical Society & 238th American Chemical Society National meeting, vol. 238, (20090818), URL: http://oasys2.confex.com/acs/238nm/techprogram/P1270376.HTM, XP009168192 | - STARKS et al., "Atomic-resolution crystal structure of thioredoxin from the acidophilic bacterium Acetobacter aceti", Protein Sci., (20070000), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 92 - 98, XP002694208 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.062519707 | - GROMER et al., "The thioredoxin system: From science to clinic", Med. Res. Rev., (20040000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 40 - 89, XP002694209 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/med.10051 | - CONRADT et al., "Expression of human interleukin-2 in recombinant baby hamster kidney ltk-, and chinese hamster ovary cells /STRUCTURE OF O-LINKED CARBOHYDRATE CHAINS AND THEIR LOCATION WITHIN THE POLYPEPTIDE", J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, no. 29, pages 17368 - 17373, XP003017499 | - DE JESUS et al., "The Influence of pH on Cell Growth and Specific Productivity of Two CHO Cell Lines Producing Human Anti Rh D IgG", Animal Cell Technology: From Target to Market, (20010000), pages 197 - 199, XP055518622 | - WHITESIDES et al., "Rates of thiol-disulfide interchange reactions between mono- and dithiols and Ellman's reagent", J. Org. Chem., (19760000), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 332 - 338, XP055518630 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00422a034 | - PLEASANTS et al., "A comparative study of the kinetics of selenol/diselenide and thiol/disulfide exchange reactions", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19890000), vol. 111, pages 6553 - 6558, XP055518635 | - HOLMGREN, "Thioredoxin catalyzes the reduction of insulin disulfides by dithiothreitol and dihydrolipoamide", J. Biol. Chem., (19790000), vol. 254, no. 19, pages 9627 - 9632, XP055514845 | - MAGNUSSON et al., "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", Mol. Immunol., (19970000), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 709 - 717, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - TSUJI et al., "Characterization of disulfide bonds in recombinant proteins: reduced human interleukin 2 in inclusion bodies and its oxidative refolding", Biochemistry, (19870000), vol. 26, pages 3129 - 3134, XP002056324 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00385a028 | - KURANO et al., "Growth behavior of Chinese hamster ovary cells in a compact loop bioreactor: 1. Effects of physical and chemical environments", J. Biotechnol., (19900000), vol. 15, pages 101 - 111, XP001088186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(90)90054-F | - MOWRY et al., "Production and purification of a chimeric monoclonal antibody against botulinum neurotoxin serotype A", Protein Expression and Purification, (20040000), vol. 37, pages 399 - 408, XP004552264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2004.06.022 | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, (19940000), vol. 745, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - HUTTERER et al., "Monoclonal antibody disulfide reduction during manufacturing: Untangling process effects from product effects", mAbs, (20130000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 608 - 613, XP055514733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.2475 | - THOMSEN et al., "The amino acid sequence of human glucagon", FEBS Letters, (19720000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 315 - 319, XP055514759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(72)80192-3 | - "Parathyroid hormone", Drugbank, (20071118), Database accession no. DB05829, XP055514766 | - MAITA N. et al., "Human α-l-iduronidase uses its own N -glycan as a substrate-binding and catalytic module", PNAS, (20130000), vol. 110, no. 36, doi:10.1073/pnas.1306939110, pages 14628 - 14633, XP055622811 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1306939110 | - SEVIER C.S. et al., "Formation and transfer of disulphide bonds in living cells", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20020000), vol. 3, pages 836 - 847, XP055622837 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm954 | - "Thiol-disulfide interchange", SINGH R., Supplement S. The chemistry of sulphur-containing functional groups, John Wiley & Sons Ltd, (19930000), pages 633 - 658, XP055623232 | - XIA L. et al., "The Mammalian Cytosolic Selenoenzyme Thioredoxin Reductase Reduces Ubiquinone", J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 2141 - 2146, XP055518085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210456200 | - IKEBUCHI M. et al., "Effect of medium pH on glutathione redox cycle in cultured human umbilical vein endothelial cells", Metabolism, (19930000), vol. 42, no. 9, pages 1121 - 1126, XP026327640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0026-0495(93)90269-T | - CHADERJIAN W.B. et al., "Effect of copper sulfate on performance of a serum-free CHO cell culture process and the level of free thiol in the recombinant antibody expressed", Biotechnol. Prog., (20050000), vol. 21, pages 550 - 553, XP002500111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP0497029 | - LYDERSEN B.K. et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Ann N. Y. Acad Sci., (19940000), vol. 75, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - CHUNG W.K. et al., "Effects of antibody disulfide bond reduction on purification process performance and final drug substance stability : Effects of Antibody Disulfide Bond Reduction", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20170000), vol. 114, no. 6, pages 1264 - 1274, XP055522850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.26265 | - MAGNUSSON C. G. M. et al., "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", Molecular Immunology, (19970000), vol. 34, no. 19, pages 709 - 717, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - R K Finn, "AGITATION-AERATION IN THE LABORATORY AND IN INDUSTRY", Finn Bacteriol Rev., (19540101), pages 254 - 274, XP055515363 | - M. P. Backer, L. S. Metzger, P. L. Slaber, K. L. Nevitt, G. B. Boder, "Large-scale production of monoclonal antibodies in suspension culture", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, Wiley, US, US, (19881005), vol. 32, no. 8, doi:10.1002/bit.260320807, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 993 - 1000, XP055315406 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260320807 | - Shouichi Higashi, Naomi Matsumoto And Sadaaki Iwanaga, "Conformation of Factor Vila Stabilized by a Labile Disulfide Bond (Cys-310-Cys-329) in the Protease Domain Is Essential for Interaction with Tissue Factor", The Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19971001), vol. 272, no. 41, pages 25724 - 25730, XP055515357 | - Sung Kwan Yoon ; Yong-Ho Ahn ; Myeong Hyeon Jeong, "Effect of culture temperature on follicle-stimulating hormone production by Chinese hamster ovary cells in a perfusion bioreactor", Applied Microbiology and Biotechnology, Springer, Berlin, DE, Berlin, DE, (20070503), vol. 76, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s00253-007-0985-x, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 83 - 89, XP019538802 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-007-0985-x | - Fujiki, Y. ; Rathnam, P. ; Saxena, B.B., "Studies on the disulfide bonds in human pituitary follicle-stimulating hormone", BBA - PROTEIN STRUCTURE., ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19800821), vol. 624, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0005-2795(80)90084-7, ISSN 0005-2795, pages 428 - 435, XP023384361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2795(80)90084-7 | - B. Fischer, "Renaturation of recombinant proteins produced as inclusion bodies", Biotech Adv., (19940101), vol. 12, doi:10.1016/0734-9750(94)90292-5, pages 89 - 101, XP055690584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0734-9750(94)90292-5 | - ROUSH DJ et al., "Advances in Primary Recovery: Centrifugation and Membrane Technology", Biotechnology Progress, (20080415), vol. 24, pages 488 - 495, XP055090116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp070414x | - BORYS MC et al., "Culture pH Affects Expression Rates and Glycosylation of Recombinant Mouse Placental Lactogen Proteins by Chinese Hamster Ovary (CHO) cells", Biotechnology, (19930600), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 720 - 724, XP002486307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0693-720 | - CROMWELL et al., "Protein Aggregation and Bioprocessing", The AAPS Journal, (20060915), vol. 8, no. 3, pages E572 - E579, XP002557046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/aapsj080366 | - SAMBROOK J et al., "Lysis of Cells", Molecular Cloning, (19890000), pages 18.30 - 18.31, XP055514944 | - OH et al., "Thioredoxin secreted upon ultraviolet A irradiation modulates activities of matrix metalloproteinase-2 and tissue inhibitor of metalloproteinase-2 in human dermal fibroblasts", Archives of Biochemistry and Biophysics, (20040301), vol. 423, pages 218 - 226, XP004488900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.abb.2003.12.026 | - MAGNUSSON et al., "Human IgG is substrate for the thioredoxin system: differential cleavage pattern of interchain disulfide bridges in IgG subclasses", Molecular Immunology, (19970700), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 709 - 717, XP002497450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(97)00092-8 | - GROMER et al., "The Thioredoxin System - From Science to Clinic", Medicinal Research Reviews, (20040100), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 40 - 89, XP002694209 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/med.10051 | - HOLMGREN, "Thioredoxin structure and mechanism: conformational changes on oxidation of the active-side sulfhydryls to a disulfide", Minireview, Structure, (19950300), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 239 - 243, XP004587846 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(01)00153-8 | - VOET et al., "2. The reactions of glycolysis", Biochemistry second edition, (19950000), page 447,618,786,811, XP055514967 | - SINGH R et al., "Thiol-disulfide interchange", THE CHEMISTRY OF SULPHUR-CONTAINING FUNCTIONAL GROUPS, John Wiley & Sons Ltd., (19930000), pages 633 - 658, XP003033408 | - LEVY et al., "Production of Correctly Folded Fab Antibody Fragment in the Cytoplasm of Escherichia coli trxB gor Mutants via the Coexpression of Molecular Chaperones", Protein Expression and Purification, (20011100), vol. 23, pages 338 - 347, XP055024235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.2001.1520 | - LUNDBLAD JL et al., "The effect of processing methods on intravenous immune globulin preparations", Journal of Hospital Infection, (19880800), vol. 12, pages 3 - 15, XP023272026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0195-6701(88)90025-4 | - SINGH R et al., "A Reagent for Reduction of Disulfide Bonds in Proteins That Reduces Disulfide Bonds Faster Than Does Dithiothreitol", Journal of Organic Chemistry, (19910300), vol. 56, pages 2332 - 2337, XP000601977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00007a018 | - ANDERSEN DC et al., "Production technologies for monoclonal antibodies and their fragments", Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (20041000), vol. 15, pages 456 - 462, XP004588033 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2004.08.002 | - "Ex- Cell CD CHO Serum-Free Medium for CHO Cells, Chemically Defined", Chemically Defined, SAFC Biosciences TM, (20060000), XP055518415 | - Product Specification, Ex- Cell ® ACF CHO Medium, Sigma Aldrich | - ZHANG W et al., "Free Sulfhydryl in Recombinant Monoclonal Antibodies", Biotechnol. Prog., (20020000), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | - WHITESIDES GM et al., "Rates of thioldisulfide interchange reactions between mono- and dithiols and Ellman's reagent", J. Org. Chem., (19770000), vol. 42, pages 332 - 338, XP055518464 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00422a034 | - TEILUM et al., "Disulfide Bond Formation and Folding of Plant Peroxidases Expressed as Inclusion Body Protein in Escherichia coli Thioredoxin Reductase Negative Strains", Protein Expression and Purification, (19990000), vol. 15, pages 77 - 82, XP004441744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1998.0985 | - POWIS et al., "Thioredoxin redox control of cell growth and death and the effects of inhibitors", Chemico-Biological Interactions, (19980000), vol. 111-112, pages 23 - 34, XP002519386 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2797(97)00148-8 | - NORDBERG et al., "Reactive oxygen species, antioxidants, and the mammalian thioredoxin system", Free Radical Biology & Medicine, (20010000), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1287 - 1312, XP002519388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0891-5849(01)00724-9 | - URIG et al., "On the potential of thioredoxin reductase inhibitors for cancer therapy", Seminars in Cancer Biology, (20060000), vol. 16, pages 452 - 465, XP005727270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.semcancer.2006.09.004 | - ZHANG et al., "Free sulfhydryl in recombinant monoclonal antibodies", Biotechnol. Prog, (20020000), vol. 18, pages 509 - 513, XP002500112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP025511Z | - TREXLER-SCHMIDT et al., "Identification and prevention of antibody disulfide bond reduction during cell culture manufacturing", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20100000), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 452 - 461, XP002694206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22699 | - KAO et al., "Mechanism of Antibody Reduction in Cell Culture Production Processes", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20100000), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 622 - 632, XP002694207 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.22848 | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, vol. 745, no. 1, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - MOWRY et al., "Production and purification of a chimeric monoclonal antibody against botulinum neurotoxin serotype A", Papers in Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 33, pages 1 - 23, XP004552264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2004.06.022 | - YIGZAW et al., "Exploitation of the adsorptive properties of depth filters for host cell protein removal during monoclonal antibody purification", Biotechnol. Prog, (20060000), vol. 22, pages 288 - 296, XP002472117 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp050274w | - A. HOLMGREN, "Thioredoxin catalyzes the reduction of insulin disulfides by dithiothreitol and dihydrolipoamide", The Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19890000), vol. 254, no. 9, pages 9627 - 9632, XP055514845 | - BERGGREN et al., "Thioredoxin and thioredoxin reductase gene expression in human tumors and cell lines, and the effects of serum stimulation and hypoxia", Anticancer Research, (19960000), vol. 16, no. 6B, pages 3459 - 3466, XP002062159 | - HUTCHINSON et al., "Shear stress analysis of mammalian cell suspensions for prediction of industrial centrifugation and its verification", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20060000), vol. 95, no. 3, pages 483 - 491, XP055514888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21029 | - LYDERSEN et al., "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, (19940000), vol. 745, no. 1, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x | - CHOLLANGI et al., "Development of Robust Antibody Purification by Optimizing Protein-A Chromatography in Combination With Precipitation Methodologies", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20151100), vol. 112, no. 11, pages 2292 - 2304, XP055519298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.25639 | - WHITESIDE et al., "Rates of thiol-disulfide interchange reactions between mono- and dithiols and Ellman's reagent", J. Org. Chem., (19770000), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 332 - 338, XP055518464 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00422a034 | - A. HOLMGREN, "Thioredoxin structure and mechanism: conformational changes on oxidation of the active-site sulfhydryls to a disulfide", Structure, (19950000), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 239 - 2434, XP004587846 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(01)00153-8 |