EP2562327 - Scaffold anchoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Reinhold-Würth-Strasse 12-17 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieland, Achim Massenbacher Weg 8 74211 Leingarten / DE | 02 /
Küenzlen, Jürgen Rüflensmühle 4 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12181171.5 | 21.08.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | DE20112051069U | 24.08.2011 Original published format: DE 202011051069 U | [2013/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2562327 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2562327 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G5/04 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
E04G5/046 (EP);
F16B45/002 (EP,US);
F16B13/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gerüstverankerung | [2013/09] | English: | Scaffold anchoring | [2013/09] | French: | Ancrage d'échafaudage | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 01.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2016 | Observations by third parties | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/30] | 15.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/30] | Appeal following examination | 11.12.2017 | Appeal received No. T0367/18 | 11.12.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.04.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]DE8102670U (IMPEX GMBH [DE]); | [XI]DE8217744U ; | [AD]DE102006023024 (ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [YD]EP1904752 (PAMA REITER STEFAN [LI]) | by applicant | DE8102670U | DE102006023024 | DE102008018428 | EP1904752 |