EP2597453 - Load measuring device and method for mechanical load testing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SD Mechatronik GmbH Im Hofpoint 10 83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duy, Sebastian An der Mangfall 10 83620 Feldkirchen / DE | 02 /
Duy, Werner Im Hofpoint 10 83620 Feldkirchen / DE | 03 /
Korn, Benjamin Heubergstrasse 19 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | 2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | 2s | ip Schramm Schneider Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | Bettinger Schneider Schramm Postfach 860267 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12182836.2 | 03.09.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | DE20111055701 | 24.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011055701 | [2013/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597453 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2597453 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597453 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/40, G01N33/15, A61K9/20, G01N33/00 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
G01N3/40 (EP);
G01N33/15 (EP);
G01N2203/0087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/22] | G01N3/40, G01N33/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2013/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Belastungsmesseinrichtung sowie Verfahren zur mechanischen Belastungsprüfung | [2013/22] | English: | Load measuring device and method for mechanical load testing | [2013/22] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de charge ainsi que procédé de test mécanique | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | MT | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 03.09.2016 | LU | 03.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | DE | 01.04.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
MT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
MT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
DE | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102009008288 (EMCO TEST PRUEFMASCHINEN GMBH [AT]) [X] 1 * Seite 1: Zusammenfassung;; figure 1 *; | [XAYI] - "Technology for Dental Materials Research", (20071231), URL: http://www.sdm-gmbh.de/fileadmin/default/PDF/produktkatalog.pdf, (20140515), XP055118329 [X] 1,3,14,15 * Seite (S.) 8, Zeilen 1-3 und 5, Absatz 2 (Principle of operation); S. 8 - untere Abbildung; S. 9, Absätze 1 (Specifications) und 2 "Performance"; S. 9: Abbildungen "Screenshot: Manual operation", "Screenshot: Simulation parameters"; S.10, Kap. "Technical Data", S. 10 - Abbildungen;; page 8 - page 10 * [A] 2 [Y] 10,11 [I] 4-9,12,13 | [YA] - Enrico Conserva ET AL, "Robotic chewing simulator for dental materials testing on a sensor-equipped implant setup", Int J Prosthodont, (20080101), pages 501 - 508, URL: http://www.researchgate.net/publication/23796164_Robotic_chewing_simulator_for_dental_materials_testing_on_a_sensor-equipped_implant_setup/file/79e4151116ac4e483e.pdf, (20140516), XP055118523 [Y] 10 * Seite (S.) 503, linke Spalte - Zeilen 4-11; S. 504, linke Spalte - Zeilen 15-17;; figure 8 * [A] 2 | [Y] - Kanal von SDMechatronik-, "Chewing simulator with Thermocycling", (20110607), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=Nz-NpnKSD2w, (20140519), XP054975407 [Y] 10,11 * 0.47-1.36 min und 2.38-2.44 min * | by applicant | DE102006004215 |