EP2544159 - Fire detection in rail vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fogtec Brandschutz GmbH & Co. KG Schanzenstrasse 19a 51063 Köln / DE | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sprakel, Dirk Hermann-Löns-Str. 26 50996 Köln / DE | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2013/02] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186988.7 | 21.04.2009 | [2013/02] | Priority number, date | DE20081028134 | 13.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008028134 | [2013/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544159 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544159 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/10, G08B29/16, A62C3/07 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
G08B17/10 (EP,US);
G08B29/16 (EP,US);
G08B29/183 (EP,US);
A62C3/07 (EP,US);
G08B17/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2013/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Branddetektion in Schienenfahrzeugen | [2013/02] | English: | Fire detection in rail vehicles | [2013/02] | French: | Détection d'incendie dans des véhicules sur rails | [2013/02] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09761541.3 / EP2286394 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2009 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | MT | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | AT | 21.04.2016 | IE | 21.04.2016 | LU | 21.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | GB | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.04.2009 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
AT | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.04.2009 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
AT | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
AT | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004008566 ; | [XYI]EP1419804 (METRO MADRID SA [ES]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0070] * * paragraphs [0072] , [0073] * * paragraphs [0078] , [0079] * * paragraph [0081] * * pages 1,2,4,7 * [Y] 3,4,6-9,13-15 [I] 5; | [Y]US2005093707 (VAN WINKLE WALLACE T [US], et al) [Y] 3,7-9 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1811478 (HEKATRON VERTRIEBS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4,6,13-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * * paragraph [0032] ** figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20040115), vol. 2004, & JP2004008566 A 20040115 (NOHMI BOSAI LTD) [Y] 8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102007004051 |