EP2549731 - Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ookuma, Satoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [2018/41] |
Former [2013/04] | Keane, David Colman Canon Europe Ltd Legal, IP and EPS 3 The Square Stockley Park GB-Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 12188566.9 | 21.06.2007 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | JP20060175020 | 26.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006175020 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2549731 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2549731 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2549731 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04N1/00464 (EP,US);
H04N1/46 (KR);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2018/41] |
Former [2013/04] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Speichermedium | [2013/04] | English: | Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and storage medium | [2013/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'image, et support de stockage | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07110813.8 / EP1874025 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070110813) is 06.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/23] | ES | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002126306 (CHOHSA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP1439684 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6856415 (SIMCHIK ANDREW D [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 7, line 10 - line 17 * * column 8, line 3 - line 7 *; | [A]WO2005114477 (ELECTRONICS FOR IMAGING INC [US]) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [Y]US2006107212 (LOVAT DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | US2002126306 | US2006056873 | by applicant | EP0711081 | JP2006085376 | EP1874025 |