|
20.06.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
14.06.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.05.2022 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.03.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.10.2021 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
29.09.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.10.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.08.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |